Lofty v. Bleeker Brodey & Andrews
Plaintiff: Bobby Lofty
Defendant: Bleeker Brodey & Andrews
Case Number: 2:2019cv01327
Filed: August 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: John H England
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 TEXT ORDER: Plaintiff has indicated that this case is settled, but that the settlement requires approval from the bankruptcy court. Consistent with Plaintiff's request, all deadlines are STAYED pending settlement approval. Plaintiff is ORDERED to file a status report regarding settlement approval by December 1, 2019, unless he has filed a notice of voluntary dismissal prior to that date. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H. England, III on 9/12/2019. (CDG, )
September 10, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Settlement by Bobby Lofty (Philipps, David)
September 9, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed Bleeker Brodey & Andrews served on 9/3/2019, answer due 9/24/2019. (AFS)
August 28, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Bleeker Brodey & Andrews mailed certified mail. (AFS)
August 19, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Bradford W Botes on behalf of Bobby Lofty (Botes, Bradford)
August 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 TEXT ORDER granting #2 Motion to Admit Pro Hac Vice attorneys David J. Philipps and Mary E. Philipps, but with the understanding and on the condition they pay the applicable fee and register for e-filing and notification within 14 days, unless they have already done so. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H England, III on 8/16/2019. (AVC)
August 16, 2019 PHV Fee paid: $75, receipt number 1126-3413963 (ALND B4601099944). (Philipps, David) Modified on 8/19/2019 (AFS).
August 16, 2019 PHV Fee paid: $75, receipt number 1126-3413959 (ALND B4601099942). (Philipps, David) Modified on 8/19/2019 (AFS).
August 16, 2019 Filing Fee: $400, receipt_number 1126-3413956 (ALND B4601099941). (Philipps, David) Modified on 8/19/2019 (AFS).
August 16, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE REGARDING CONSENT of a magistrate judge in a civil action. (AFS)
August 16, 2019 Filing 3 Request for service by certified mail filed by Bobby Lofty. (AFS)
August 16, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Motion is RIPE 8/16/2019. Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion.Filed by Bobby Lofty. (Attachments: #1 Consent of Local Counsel)(AFS)
August 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Bleeker Brodey & Andrews, filed by Bobby Lofty. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Group A)(AFS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lofty v. Bleeker Brodey & Andrews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bleeker Brodey & Andrews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bobby Lofty
Represented By: Bradford W Botes
Represented By: Mary Elizabeth Philipps
Represented By: David J. Philipps
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?