Jordan v. Standard Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Terra Jordan
Defendant: Standard Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2019cv01329
Filed: August 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Abdul K Kallon
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 14, 2019 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Standard Insurance Company. filed by Standard Insurance Company (Maples, Marcus)
October 14, 2019 Filing 7 Defendant's ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Standard Insurance Company.(Maples, Marcus)
October 9, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Chad Wallace by Standard Insurance Company. (Maples, Marcus)
October 2, 2019 Reset Deadlines: Standard Insurance Company Answer due October 14, 2019. (JLC)
October 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER GRANTING #4 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint. Signed by Judge Abdul K Kallon on 10/2/2019. (JLC)
September 30, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Standard Insurance Company. (Maples, Marcus)
September 13, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed Standard Insurance Company served on 9/9/2019, answer due 9/30/2019. (AFS)
September 6, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Standard Insurance Company mailed certified mail. (AFS)
August 21, 2019 Filing Fee: $400, receipt_number 1126-3416867 (ALND B4601100045) (Stansberry, Amanda) Modified on 8/21/2019 (AFS).
August 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Standard Insurance Company, filed by Terra Jordan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(AFS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jordan v. Standard Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Standard Insurance Company
Represented By: Marcus Monte Maples
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terra Jordan
Represented By: Amanda Lane Stansberry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?