Certain Subscribing Underwriters at Lloyd's, London et al v. McCullers-Capps & Associates, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: HDI Global Specialty SE and Certain Subscribing Underwriters at Lloyd's, London
Defendant: Alex Tice and Scott Bridge Company, Inc.
3Rd Party Plaintiff: McCullers-Capps & Associates, Inc.
3Rd Party Defendant: Russell McMillan
Case Number: 2:2019cv01333
Filed: August 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: R David Proctor
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 1, 2019 Filing 18 Summons Returned Unexecuted by Certain Subscribing Underwriters at Lloyd's, London, HDI Global Specialty SE as to Alex Tice. (KAM)
September 26, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Jason Edward Lee on behalf of Scott Bridge Company, Inc. (Lee, Jason)
September 26, 2019 Reset Deadlines as to #11 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Responses due by 10/28/2019 (KAM)
September 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 TEXT ORDER-This matter is before the court on Plaintiffs' Motion for an Extension of Time to Respond to Defendants' Motions to Dismiss #15 . The motion is not opposed by Defendant Scott Bridge.The motion is opposed by Defendant McCuller's-Capps & Associates, Inc. The court advises all parties to remember the golden rule in their dealings with one another and with the court. For good cause shown, and because an extension of time is not prejudicial, the Motion #14 is granted. Plaintiff's SHALL respond to Defendants' Motions to Dismiss #9 #11 on or before October 28, 2019. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 9/26/2019. (KAM)
September 24, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Motion to Dismiss by Certain Subscribing Underwriters at Lloyd's, London, HDI Global Specialty SE. (Salter, Scott)
September 23, 2019 Filing 14 Summons Issued as to Russell McMillan. Sent via certified mail. (KEK)
September 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 TEXT ORDER This case is before the court on Defendant Scott Bridge Company's Motion to Dismiss #11 . The parties are REMINDED to brief the Motion #11 in accordance with Exhibit B to the court's Initial Order #12 . Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 9/18/2019. (KAM)
September 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 INITIAL ORDER - with appendices attached. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 9/18/2019. (KAM)
September 17, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Scott Bridge Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Cowan, Joseph)
September 16, 2019 Filing 10 Request for service by certified mail filed by McCullers-Capps & Associates, Inc.. (Grimes, John)
September 16, 2019 Filing 9 MCCULLERS-CAPPS, INC. ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand , First THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against RUSSELL MCMILLAN MCMILLAN INSURANCE SERVICES by McCullers-Capps & Associates, Inc..(Grimes, John)
September 4, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Returned Unexecuted by Certain Subscribing Underwriters at Lloyd's, London, HDI Global Specialty SE as to McCullers-Capps & Associates, Inc.. (KAM)
August 29, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Certain Subscribing Underwriters at Lloyd's, London, HDI Global Specialty SE. Scott Bridge Company, Inc. served on 8/27/2019, answer due 9/17/2019. (KAM)
August 26, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by HDI Global Specialty SE. McCullers-Capps & Associates, Inc. served on 8/24/2019, answer due 9/14/2019. (JLC)
August 23, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Certain Subscribing Underwriters at Lloyd's, London, HDI Global Specialty SE. McCullers-Capps & Associates, Inc. served on 8/23/2019, answer due 9/13/2019. (Salter, Scott)
August 22, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Alex Tice via certified U.S. Mail on this the 22nd day of August, 2019. (JLC)
August 22, 2019 Filing 3 Alias Summons Issued as to McCullers-Capps & Associates, Inc. returned to Plaintiff for service on this the 22nd day of August, 2019. (JLC)
August 21, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to McCullers-Capps & Associates, Inc., Scott Bridge Company, Inc. mailed certified mail (KAM)
August 20, 2019 Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number B401100020 (KAM)
August 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT For Declartory Relief against McCullers-Capps & Associates, Inc., Scott Bridge Company, Inc., Alex Tice, filed by Certain Subscribing Underwriters at Lloyd's, London, HDI Global Specialty SE.(JLC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Certain Subscribing Underwriters at Lloyd's, London et al v. McCullers-Capps & Associates, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alex Tice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Bridge Company, Inc.
Represented By: Jason Edward Lee
Represented By: Joseph L Cowan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: McCullers-Capps & Associates, Inc.
Represented By: John W Grimes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HDI Global Specialty SE
Represented By: Scott M Salter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Certain Subscribing Underwriters at Lloyd's, London
Represented By: Scott M Salter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Russell McMillan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?