Battle et al v. Nationwide Mutual Fire Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Valeria Battle and Reverend Ocie Battle, Jr
Defendant: Nationwide Mutual Fire Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2019cv01348
Filed: August 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Staci G Cornelius
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 4, 2019 Filing 15 RESPONSE to #13 MOTION to Remand filed by Nationwide Mutual Fire Insurance Company. (Johnson, John) Modified text on 10/4/2019 (MRR, ).
September 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 TEXT ORDER: The plaintiffs have filed a motion to remand. (Doc #13 ). The defendant SHALL file a response to the motion within fourteen (14) calendar days from the entry date of this order. The response SHALL be limited to fifteen (15) pages. The plaintiffs SHALL file any reply within seven (7) calendar days from the date on which the plaintiffs' response is due. Any reply SHALL be limited to ten (10) pages. Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 9/20/2019. (KEK)
September 19, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Ocie Battle, Jr, Valeria Battle. (Brooks, Gerald)
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER REGARDING COMPLIANCE WITH RULE 26. Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 9/13/19. (MRR, )
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 INITIAL ORDER GOVERNING ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 9/13/19. (MRR, )
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 TEXT ORDER: the telephone status conference set for 10:00 a.m. on September 10, 2019, is CANCELLED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 9/10/2019. (MSN)
September 10, 2019 Filing 9 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge. (MRR, )
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT ORDER: A telephone status conference is currently set for 10:00 a.m. on September 10, 2019. (Doc. #7 ). The parties are REMINDED that the status conference will be cancelled by separate order if, prior to the date of the conference, all parties submit forms indicating whether they consent to magistrate judge jurisdiction. Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 9/9/2019. (MSN)
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER - Pursuant to the General Order For Referral of Civil Matters to the United States Magistrate Judges of the Northern District of Alabama, dated January 2, 2015, the parties are REQUIRED to enter an election regarding the exercise of dispositive jurisdiction by a magistrate judge pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c) no later than October 11, 2019. In the absence of consent by all parties, the Clerk is hereby DIRECTED to reassign the case to a district judge without further order after October 11, 2019. A telephone status conference is hereby SET for 10:00 a.m. on September 10, 2019. The parties are DIRECTED to call 877-336-1831 to access the telephone conference. The access code is 2778178. The telephone conference will be cancelled if all forms are submitted twenty-four hours in advance. Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 8/28/19. (MRR, )
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ORDER: The defendant has filed a motion to dismiss Count III of the plaintiffs' amended complaint. (Doc. #5 ). The plaintiffs SHALL file a response to the motion within fourteen (14) calendar days from the entry date of this order. The response SHALL be limited to fifteen (15) pages. The defendant SHALL file any reply within seven (7) calendar from the date on which the plaintiffs' response is due. Any reply SHALL be limited to ten (10) pages. Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 8/28/19. (MRR, )
August 27, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss COUNT III OF PLAINTIFFS' FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT by Nationwide Mutual Fire Insurance Company. (Johnson, John)
August 27, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to Amended Complaint by Nationwide Mutual Fire Insurance Company.(Johnson, John)
August 20, 2019 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-3415847 (B4601100015). related document #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Jefferson County, case number 69-cv-2019-900595., filed by Nationwide Mutual Fire Insurance Company. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(MRR, ). (Johnson, John) Modified on 8/21/2019 (MRR, ).
August 20, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE REGARDING CONSENT to magistrate judge jurisdiction (MRR, )
August 20, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure by Nationwide Mutual Fire Insurance Company (MRR, )
August 20, 2019 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Nationwide Mutual Fire Insurance Company, filed by Valeria Battle, Ocie Battle, Jr.- Deemed filed 7/12/19, Circuit Court of Jefferson County (Doc 1-1 p 10 of 22)(MRR, )
August 20, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Jefferson County, case number 69-cv-2019-900595., filed by Nationwide Mutual Fire Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(MRR, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Battle et al v. Nationwide Mutual Fire Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationwide Mutual Fire Insurance Company
Represented By: John W Johnson, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Valeria Battle
Represented By: Summer A Wells
Represented By: Gerald Clark Brooks, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reverend Ocie Battle, Jr
Represented By: Summer A Wells
Represented By: Gerald Clark Brooks, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?