Maxwell v. Prevette
Plaintiff: Kirk V. Maxwell
Defendant: Suzane Prevette
Case Number: 2:2019cv01360
Filed: August 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: L Scott Coogler
Referring Judge: Herman N Johnson
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 21, 2019 Filing 5 Case transferred in from District of New York Southern; Case Number 1:19-cv-07504. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
August 14, 2019 CASE TRANSFERRED OUT ELECTRONICALLY from the U.S.D.C. Southern District of New York to the United States District Court - District of Northern District of Alabama, Southern Division. (ne) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/21/2019.]
August 14, 2019 Mailed a copy of #4 Order, to Kirk V. Maxwell 29706-001 Federal Correctional Low Post Care 5000 Yazoo City, MS 39194. (aea) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/21/2019.]
August 14, 2019 NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - SUA SPONTE to Judge Colleen McMahon. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (mro) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/21/2019.]
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 TRANSFER ORDER: The Clerk of Court is directed to assign this matter to my docket, mail a copy of this order to Plaintiff, and note service on the docket. The Clerk of Court is further directed to transfer this action to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Alabama, Southern Division. Whether Plaintiff should be permitted to proceed further without prepayment of fees is a determination to be made by the transferee court. A summons shall not issue from this Court. This order closes this case. The Court certifies, pursuant to 28 U.S.C 1915(a)(3), that any appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. See Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962). (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 8/14/2019) (mro) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing. Transmission to Office of the Clerk of Court for processing. [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/21/2019.]
August 9, 2019 Filing 3 PRISONER AUTHORIZATION. Document filed by Kirk V. Maxwell.(rdz) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/21/2019.]
August 9, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (rdz) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/21/2019.]
August 9, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Suzane Prevette. Document filed by Kirk V. Maxwell.(rdz) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/21/2019.]
August 9, 2019 Filing 1 REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Document filed by Kirk V. Maxwell.(rdz) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/21/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Maxwell v. Prevette
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kirk V. Maxwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Suzane Prevette
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?