Brechin v. Life Insurance Company of North America
Plaintiff: Daniel Brechin
Defendant: Life Insurance Company of North America
Case Number: 2:2019cv01374
Filed: August 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Abdul K Kallon
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 21, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Life Insurance Company of North America.(Murphy, Grace)
September 30, 2019 Reset Deadlines: Life Insurance Company of North America answer due 10/21/2019. (AFS)
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time. The Defendant's responsive pleading is due 10/21/2019. Signed by Judge Abdul K Kallon on 9/30/2019. (AFS)
September 26, 2019 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Life Insurance Company of North America. filed by Life Insurance Company of North America (Murphy, Grace)
September 26, 2019 Filing 4 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading to Plaintiff's Complaint by Life Insurance Company of North America. (Murphy, Grace)
September 13, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed Life Insurance Company of North America served on 9/9/2019, answer due 9/30/2019. (AFS)
September 6, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Life Insurance Company of North America mailed certified mail. (AFS)
August 25, 2019 Filing Fee: $ 400, receipt_number 1126-3419525 (ALND B 4601100106) (Stansberry, Amanda) Modified on 8/26/2019 (AFS).
August 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Life Insurance Company of North America, filed by Daniel Brechin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H)(AFS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brechin v. Life Insurance Company of North America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Life Insurance Company of North America
Represented By: Grace Robinson Murphy
Represented By: William B Wahlheim, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Brechin
Represented By: Amanda Lane Stansberry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?