Ervin Cable Consruction LLC v. Admiral Insurance Group et al
Plaintiff: Ervin Cable Consruction LLC
Defendant: Admiral Insurance Group and All Type Utilities LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv01378
Filed: August 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Gray M Borden
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT ORDER granting #7 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint. Admiral Insurance Company's answer is due on or before 10/25/2019; All Type Utilities LLC's answer is due on or before 10/25/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gray M. Borden on 9/30/2019. (KMAW)
September 30, 2019 Filing 7 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time To Respond to Complaint by Admiral Insurance Group, All Type Utilities LLC. (Barze, R) Modified text on 10/1/2019 (MRR, ).
September 17, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed All Type Utilities LLC served (no date entered on green card)(MRR, )
September 12, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed Admiral Insurance Group served on 9/9/2019, answer due 9/30/2019. (MRR, )
September 4, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Admiral Insurance Group, All Type Utilities LLC., sent via certified mail (MRR, )
August 26, 2019 Filing 3 Request for service by certified mail filed by Ervin Cable Consruction LLC. (Hawthorne, Robert Trey)
August 26, 2019 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-3419965 (B4601100110). related document #1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Ervin Cable Consruction LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(MRR, ). (Hawthorne, Robert Trey) Modified on 8/26/2019 (MRR, ).
August 26, 2019 REMOVED DOC 3- Request for service by certified mail filed by Ervin Cable Consruction LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Subcontract, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit B - COI, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit C - Demand Letters)(Hawthorne, Robert Trey)-Incorrect document attached. (MRR, )
August 23, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE REGARDING CONSENT to magistrate judge jurisdiction (MRR, )
August 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Ervin Cable Consruction LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(MRR, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ervin Cable Consruction LLC v. Admiral Insurance Group et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Admiral Insurance Group
Represented By: R Bruce Barze, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: All Type Utilities LLC
Represented By: R Bruce Barze, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ervin Cable Consruction LLC
Represented By: Robert Trey E Hawthorne, III
Represented By: Marcus A Jaskolka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?