FR v. Pouncey et al
Plaintiff: FR
Defendant: Dr Craig Pouncey and Jefferson County Board of Education
Case Number: 2:2019cv01427
Filed: August 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Liles C Burke
Referring Judge: Staci G Cornelius
Nature of Suit: Education
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 TEXT ORDER that a telephone conference is set for 10/29/2019 at 10:00 a.m. before the undersigned; Dial in information will be emailed to counsel. Signed by Judge Liles C Burke on 10/25/19. (SPT )
October 24, 2019 Filing 21 MOTION for Protective Order Defendants' Objections to Discovery Requests and Motion for Protective Order by Jefferson County Board of Education, Craig Pouncey. (Johnson, Carl)
October 24, 2019 Filing 20 REPLY to Response to Motion re #17 MOTION to Dismiss Defendants' Amended Stipulation and Motion to Dismiss Reply to Plaintiff's Response to Defendants' Amended Stipulation and Motion to Dismiss filed by Jefferson County Board of Education, Craig Pouncey. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Johnson, Carl)
October 21, 2019 Filing 19 RESPONSE in Opposition re #17 MOTION to Dismiss Defendants' Amended Stipulation and Motion to Dismiss filed by FR. (Ladores, Andrew)
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 TEXT ORDER setting motion deadline #17 Motion to Dismiss. The Plaintiff is hereby ordered to file a response to the Defendant's motion on or before October 28, 2019. Signed by Judge Liles C Burke on 10/21/2019. (KBW)
October 18, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION to Dismiss Defendants' Amended Stipulation and Motion to Dismiss by Jefferson County Board of Education, Craig Pouncey. (Johnson, Carl)
October 17, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION to Dismiss Defendants' Stipulation and Motion to Dismiss by Jefferson County Board of Education, Craig Pouncey. (Johnson, Carl)
October 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 INITIAL ORDER GOVERNING ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS - with appendices attached. Signed by Judge Liles C Burke on 10/3/2019. (AHI)
October 2, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Service of Discovery by FR.(Ladores, Andrew)
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 TEXT ORDER that a bench trial is set for 12/9/2019 at 9:00 a.m. in the Hugo L Black US Courthouse, Birmingham, AL before Judge Liles C Burke. Signed by Judge Liles C Burke on 09/06/19. (SPT )
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 TEXT ORDER granting #2 Motion to proceed anonymously. Signed by Judge Liles C Burke on 9/6/2019. (KBW)
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER that the Emergency Ex Parte Motion is DENIED as Moot and the parties are ORDERED to engage in an abbreviated discovery period to last no more than 45 days; Dispositive Motions due by 10/21/2019; The court will set an expedited hearing on any motions for early 11/2019; as more fully set out in order. Signed by Judge Liles C Burke on 9/6/2019. (AHI)
September 6, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Carl E Johnson, Jr on behalf of Jefferson County Board of Education, Craig Pouncey (Johnson, Carl)
September 3, 2019 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Jefferson County Board of Education, Craig Pouncey. Returned to Plaintiff for service. (KEK)
September 3, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Liles C Burke: Telephone Conference held on 9/3/2019; Andrew Lodores on behalf of the pla and Carl Johnson and Samantha Smith on behalf of dft. (Court Reporter Sabrina Lewis.) (SPT )
September 3, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Liles C Burke: Telephone Conference held on 9/3/2019; Andrew Ladores and Carl Johnson present for all parties. (SPT )
September 3, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT - The above-styled civil action has been reassigned to the Honorable Liles C. Burke. Please use case number 2:19-cv-1427-LCB on all subsequent pleadings. (KEK)
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TEXT ORDER that a telephone conference is set for 9/3/2019 at 01:30 p.m.; The dial-in information will be emailed to counsel. Signed by Judge Liles C Burke on 09/03/19. (SPT )
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ORDER setting ex parte hearing on #4 Motion to Expedite. An ex parte telephone conference is set for 9/3/2019, at 11:00 AM. Dial-in information will be sent by a separate email. Signed by Judge Liles C Burke on 9/3/2019. (KBW)
September 3, 2019 Filing 5 Notice of Reassignment- The above-styled civil action has been reassigned to the Honorable Madeline Hughes Haikala. Please use case number 2:19-cv-1427-MHH on all subsequent pleadings. Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius no longer assigned to the case. (MRR, )
August 31, 2019 Filing 4 Emergency Ex Parte MOTION for Temporary Injunction Motion is RIPE 8/31/2019. Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion.Filed, MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by FR. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Ladores, Andrew) Modified text on 9/3/2019 (MRR, ).
August 30, 2019 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-3424880 (ALNDClerk 19-0026). related document #1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by FR.(MRR, ). (Ladores, Andrew) Modified on 9/3/2019 (MRR, ).
August 30, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE REGARDING CONSENT to magistrate judge jurisdiction (MRR, )
August 29, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to Proceed Anonymously by FR. (MRR, )
August 29, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by FR.(MRR, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: FR v. Pouncey et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr Craig Pouncey
Represented By: Carl E Johnson, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jefferson County Board of Education
Represented By: Carl E Johnson, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FR
Represented By: Andrew Seth Ladores
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?