Wineman v. Jacksonville, The City of
Plaintiff: Gerald Wineman
Defendant: Jacksonville, The City of
Case Number: 2:2019cv01436
Filed: August 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Staci G Cornelius
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 29:621
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 INITIAL ORDER GOVERNING ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 9/24/19. (MRR, )
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT ORDER: The telephone status conference set for 11:15 a.m on October 2, 2019, is CANCELLED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 9/23/2019. (MSN)
September 23, 2019 Filing 8 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge. (MRR, )
September 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER - Pursuant to the General Order For Referral of Civil Matters to the United States Magistrate Judges of the Northern District of Alabama, dated January 2, 2015, the parties are REQUIRED to enter an election regarding the exercise of dispositive jurisdiction by a magistrate judge pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c) no later than November 1, 2019. In the absence of consent by all parties, the Clerk is hereby DIRECTED to reassign the case to a district judge without further order after November 1, 2019. A telephone status conference is hereby SET for 11:15 a.m on October 2, 2019. The parties are DIRECTED to call 877-336-1831 to access the telephone conference. The access code is 2778178. The telephone conference will be cancelled if all forms are submitted twenty-four hours in advance. Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 9/18/19. (MRR, )
September 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REGARDING COMPLIANCE WITH RULE 26. Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 9/18/19. (MRR, )
September 17, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Jacksonville, The City of.(Howard, Howard)
September 11, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gerald Wineman. Jacksonville, The City of served on 9/6/2019, answer due 9/27/2019. (Goldfarb, Jon)
September 4, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Jacksonville, The City of., returned to pltf for service (MRR, )
September 3, 2019 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-3425718 (B4601100282). related document #1 COMPLAINT against Jacksonville, The City of, filed by Gerald Wineman.(MRR, ). (Goldfarb, Jon) Modified on 9/4/2019 (MRR, ).
August 30, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE REGARDING CONSENT to magistrate judge jurisdiction (MRR, )
August 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Jacksonville, The City of, filed by Gerald Wineman.(MRR, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wineman v. Jacksonville, The City of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gerald Wineman
Represented By: Christina Maxine Malmat
Represented By: L William Smith
Represented By: Jon C Goldfarb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jacksonville, The City of
Represented By: Howard Edgar Howard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?