Staten v. Chubb Group Insurance et al
Plaintiff: Sandra J. Staten
Defendant: Broadspire A Crawford Company, Chubb Group Insurance and Federal Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2019cv01446
Filed: September 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Karon O Bowdre
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 31, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Returned Unexecuted by Sandra J. Staten as to Broadspire A Crawford Company. (JLC)
October 30, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sandra J. Staten. Chubb Group Insurance served on 10/30/2019, answer due 11/20/2019; Federal Insurance Company served on 10/30/2019, answer due 11/20/2019. (JLC)
October 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER DENYING #2 MOTION for Appointment of Counsel. Signed by Chief Judge Karon O Bowdre on 10/18/2019. (JLC)
October 11, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Broadspire A Crawford Company, Chubb Group Insurance, Federal Insurance Company, delivered to the USM for service on this the 11th day of October, 2019. (JLC)
October 11, 2019 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Broadspire A Crawford Company, Chubb Group Insurance, Federal Insurance Company, filed by Sandra J. Staten.(JLC)
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER - This case is before the court on the Plaintiffs motion to proceed in forma pauperis and motion for appointment of an attorney. (Doc. #2 ). The court GRANTS the Plaintiffs motion to proceed in forma pauperis and will allow the Plaintiff to file this action without prepayment of fees, costs, or security.But, the court DEFERS RULING on the Plaintiffs motion for appointment of an attorney. (Doc. #2 ). Further, the court ORDERS the Plaintiff to file by October 14, 2019, a typed Amended Complaint that complies with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 8(a), 8(d)(1), 10(b), and 11(b). Signed by Chief Judge Karon O Bowdre on 9/13/2019. (KEK)
September 3, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Sandra J. Staten. (JLC)
September 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Broadspire A Crawford Company, Chubb Group Insurance, filed by Sandra J. Staten.(JLC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Staten v. Chubb Group Insurance et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Broadspire A Crawford Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chubb Group Insurance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra J. Staten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?