McQueen v. Grocery Store
Plaintiff: Marcus D McQueen
Defendant: Grocery Store
Case Number: 2:2019cv01449
Filed: September 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: John H England
Referring Judge: Corey L Maze
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER OF DISMISSAL - On September 4, 2019, the Court ordered McQueen to file an amended complaint within 21 days. McQueen did not amend his complaint. Nor has McQueen taken any other action to prosecute his case. Accordingly, the Court hereby DISMISSES WITHOUT PREJUDICE McQueen's complaint for (a) lack of subject matter jurisdiction (i.e. McQueen has failed to plead a claim under 1983) and/or (b) failure to prosecute (i.e. McQueen failed to comply with this Court's order to amend his complaint and thus failed to, among other things, invoke the Courts jurisdiction and properly identify the Defendant(s) to this action). Signed by Judge Corey L Maze on 10/7/2019. (KEK)
September 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. This Case is hereby reassigned to Judge Corey L Maze for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge John H England, III no longer assigned to case. Please use case number 2:19-CV-1449-CLM on all future pleadings. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H England, III on 9/26/2019. (JLC)
September 4, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE REGARDING CONSENT of a magistrate judge in a civil action. (AFS)
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER the motion to proceed in forma pauperis is GRANTED. Plaintiff is ORDERED to file an amended complaint within 21 days from the entry of this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H England, III on 9/4/2019. (AFS)
September 3, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis Motion is RIPE 9/3/2019. Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion.Filed by Marcus D McQueen. (KEK)
September 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Grocery Store, filed by Marcus D McQueen.(KEK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McQueen v. Grocery Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grocery Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marcus D McQueen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?