Richardson v. Watson
Plaintiff: John W Richardson
Defendant: Rochelle Watson and IRS
Case Number: 2:2019cv01452
Filed: September 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Annemarie Carney Axon
Referring Judge: John E Ott
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 FINAL ORDER - Having reviewed the entire record, the court agrees with the magistrate judge's analysis that the case is due to be dismissed under 1915(e)(2)(B). Accordingly, for the reasons outlined in the magistrate judge's September 10, 2019 and September 23, 2019 orders, the court DISMISSES this action WITHOUT PREJUDICE. The court DENIES AS MOOT the motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge Annemarie Carney Axon on 9/24/2019. (KEK)
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. This case is hereby reassigned to Judge Annemarie Carney Axon for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge John E Ott no longer assigned to case. Please use case number 2:19-CV-1452-ACA on all future pleadings. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Ott on 9/23/2019. (JLC)
September 17, 2019 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Rochelle Watson, IRS, filed by John W Richardson.(KAM)
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER the court DEFERS further consideration of Richardsons IFP application; plaintiff is ORDERED to file an amended complaint correcting the pleading defects noted by September 25, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Ott on 9/10/2019. (KAM)
September 3, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis Motion is RIPE 9/3/2019. Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion.Filed by John W Richardson. (KAM)
September 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Rochelle Watson, filed by John W Richardson.(KAM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Richardson v. Watson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rochelle Watson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IRS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John W Richardson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?