City of Graysville Alabama v. Lowe's Home Centers Inc
Plaintiff: City of Graysville Alabama
Defendant: Lowe's Home Centers Inc
Case Number: 2:2019cv01492
Filed: September 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Corey L Maze
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 INITIAL ORDER GOVERNING ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS - with appendices attached. Signed by Judge Corey L. Maze on 9/19/2019. (SRD)
September 17, 2019 Filing 3 RESPONSE in Opposition re #2 First MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by City of Graysville Alabama. (Thompson, J)
September 13, 2019 Filing 2 First MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by Lowe's Home Centers Inc. (Ford, Sara)
September 9, 2019 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-3429854. related document #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Lowe's Home Centers Inc from Circuit Court of Jefferson County, case number 01-CV-2019-902795.00, filed by Lowe's Home Centers Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(SRD). (Ford, Sara)
September 6, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Lowe's Home Centers Inc from Circuit Court of Jefferson County, case number 01-CV-2019-902795.00, filed by Lowe's Home Centers Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(SRD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: City of Graysville Alabama v. Lowe's Home Centers Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lowe's Home Centers Inc
Represented By: Sara Anne Ford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of Graysville Alabama
Represented By: J Ken Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?