Furlow v. Midland Credit Management Inc
Plaintiff: Ameena Furlow
Defendant: Midland Credit Management Inc
Case Number: 2:2019cv01508
Filed: September 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Madeline Hughes Haikala
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 TEXT ORDER: Plaintiff has filed a Notice of Settlement. (Doc. #9 ). On or before December 30, 2019, plaintiff shall file a notice of dismissal or a report updating the Court on the status of the settlement. Signed by Judge Madeline Hughes Haikala on 11/7/2019. (YMB)
November 7, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT by Ameena Furlow (Philipps, David) Modified on 11/7/2019 (KEK).
October 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT ORDER: The Court grants defendant's unopposed motion for extension of time. (Doc. #7 ). Midland Credit Management Inc shall respond to the Complaint on or before 11/11/2019. Signed by Judge Madeline Hughes Haikala on 10/18/2019. (YMB)
October 18, 2019 Filing 7 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Midland Credit Management Inc. (Hoffmann, Jonathan)
September 26, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Midland Credit Management Inc. Sent via certified mail. (KEK)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 TEXT ORDER: The Court GRANTS Attorneys David J. Philipps' and Mary E. Philipps' motion to appear pro hac vice in this action. (Doc. #3 . Signed by Judge Madeline Hughes Haikala on 9/12/2019. (YMB)
September 12, 2019 PHV Fee paid: $ 75, receipt number 1126-3432866 (ALND B4601100586). (Philipps, David) Modified on 9/12/2019 (KEK).
September 12, 2019 PHV Fee paid: $ 75, receipt number 1126-3432865 (ALND B4601100585). (Philipps, David) Modified on 9/12/2019 (KEK).
September 12, 2019 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-3432863 (ALND B4601100584) related document #1 COMPLAINT against Midland Credit Management Inc, filed by Ameena Furlow. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(KEK). (Philipps, David) Modified on 9/12/2019 (KEK).
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 INITIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge Madeline Hughes Haikala on 9/12/2019. (KEK)
September 11, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Ameena Furlow. (Attachments: #1 Consent of local counsel)(KEK)
September 11, 2019 Filing 2 Request for service by certified mail filed by Ameena Furlow. (KEK)
September 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Midland Credit Management Inc, filed by Ameena Furlow. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(KEK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Furlow v. Midland Credit Management Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ameena Furlow
Represented By: Bradford W Botes
Represented By: David J. Philipps
Represented By: Mary Elizabeth Philipps
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Midland Credit Management Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?