Kates v. EBSCO Industries Inc
Plaintiff: Lori Kates
Defendant: EBSCO Industries Inc
Case Number: 2:2019cv01513
Filed: September 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Staci G Cornelius
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT ORDER: The defendant's unopposed motion for a second extension of time to respond to the complaint is GRANTED. (Doc. #7 ). The defendant SHALL respond to the complaint by November 18, 2019. No further extensions will be granted absent good cause shown. Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 11/1/19. (MRR, )
October 25, 2019 Filing 7 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint Motion is RIPE 10/25/2019. Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion.Filed by EBSCO Industries Inc. (Baker, Tammy)
October 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ORDER: The defendant's unopposed motion seeking an extension of time to respond to the complaint is GRANTED. (Doc. #5 ). The defendant SHALL respond to the complaint by October 28, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 10/3/19. (MRR, )
October 1, 2019 Filing 5 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Motion is RIPE 10/1/2019. Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion.Filed by EBSCO Industries Inc. (Baker, Tammy)
September 30, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lori Kates. EBSCO Industries Inc served on 9/16/2019, answer due 10/7/2019. (Goldfarb, Jon)
September 12, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to EBSCO Industries Inc., returned to pltf for service (MRR, )
September 11, 2019 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-3432319 (B4601100563). related document #1 COMPLAINT against EBSCO Industries Inc, filed by Lori Kates.(MRR, ). (Goldfarb, Jon) Modified on 9/13/2019 (MRR, ).
September 11, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE REGARDING CONSENT to magistrate judge jurisdiction (MRR, )
September 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against EBSCO Industries Inc, filed by Lori Kates.(MRR, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kates v. EBSCO Industries Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lori Kates
Represented By: Christina Maxine Malmat
Represented By: L William Smith
Represented By: Jon C Goldfarb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EBSCO Industries Inc
Represented By: Tammy L Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?