Lawrence v. Fairfield, City of
Plaintiff: Becountiss Lawrence
Defendant: Fairfield, City of
Case Number: 2:2019cv01532
Filed: September 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: John H England
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SCHEDULING ORDER:Certain time limits apply as set out in this order: Amended Pleadings due by 12/16/2019. Discovery due by 7/1/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 8/3/2020. Trial ready by October 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H England, III on 11/08/2019. (AKD)
November 8, 2019 Filing 13 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Schatz, David)
November 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 TEXT ORDER The parties have failed to file their Rule 26(f) Report of Parties Planning Meeting. The parties are ORDERED to file their report by November 15, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H. England, III on 11/8/2019. (CLS2)
October 4, 2019 NOTICE The telephone conference set for 11/1/2019 is CANCELLED. (KAM)
October 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 INITIAL ORDER GOVERNING ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS Signed by Magistrate Judge John H England, III on 10/04/2019. (AKD)
October 4, 2019 Filing 10 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge (AKD)
October 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REGARDING COMPLIANCE WITH RULE 26(f). Signed by Magistrate Judge John H England, III on 10/03/2019. (AKD)
October 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER - Pursuant to the General Order For Referral of Civil Matters to the United States Magistrate Judges of the Northern District of Alabama, dated January 2, 2015, the parties are REQUIRED to enter an election regarding the exercise of dispositive jurisdiction by a magistrate judge pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c) no later than 11/18/2019. In the absence of consent by all parties, the Clerk is hereby DIRECTED to reassign the case to a district judge without further order after 11/18/2019. A telephone status conference is hereby SET for 10:30 am on 11/01/2019. The parties are DIRECTED to call 877-873-8017 to access the telephone conference. The access code is 4577302. The telephone conference will be cancelled if all forms are submitted twenty-four hours in advance. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H England, III on 10/03/2019. (AKD, )
October 2, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Patrice Blankenship on behalf of Fairfield, City of (Blankenship, Patrice)
October 2, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by Fairfield, City of.(Blankenship, Patrice)
September 20, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Becountiss Lawrence. Fairfield, City of served on 9/20/2019, answer due 10/11/2019. (green card signed, undated) (KAM)
September 17, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Fairfield, City of. mailed certified mail (KAM)
September 17, 2019 Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number B4601100668 (KAM)
September 17, 2019 Filing 2 Request for service by certified mail filed by Becountiss Lawrence. (AFS)
September 16, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE REGARDING CONSENT of a magistrate judge in a civil action. (AFS)
September 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Fairfield, City of, filed by Becountiss Lawrence.(AFS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lawrence v. Fairfield, City of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fairfield, City of
Represented By: Patrice Blankenship
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Becountiss Lawrence
Represented By: David Jeremy Schatz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?