Goldberg v. Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company, The
Plaintiff: Dan A Goldberg
Defendant: Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company, The
Case Number: 2:2019cv01533
Filed: September 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: John H England
Referring Judge: R David Proctor
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 INITIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 10/24/2019. (JLC)
October 21, 2019 Filing 8 Notice of Reassignment The parties having not unanimously consented to the dispositive jurisdiction by a Magistrate Judge, the above styled civil action has been randomly reassigned to the Honorable R. David Proctor. Please use case number 2:19 CV 1533 RDP on all subsequent pleadings. (AKD)
October 16, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge John H England, III: Telephone Conference held on 10/16/2019; Attorneys S. Carnley and W. Williams present by phone for pltf; Attorney C. Newton present by phone for dft; consent process discussed; conf adj. (AVC)
October 16, 2019 Filing 7 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Newton, Candace)
September 17, 2019 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-3435748. related document #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company The from Circuit Court of Shelby County, Alabama, case number 58-cv-2019-900893.00., filed by The Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A part 1, # 2 Exhibit A part 2)(AFS). (Newton, Candace) NDAL rec# B4601100667 Modified on 9/17/2019 (KAM).
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Regarding Compliance with Rule 26(f). Signed by Magistrate Judge John H England, III on 9/17/2019. (AFS)
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER - Pursuant to the General Order For Referral of Civil Matters to the United States Magistrate Judges of the Northern District of Alabama, dated January 2, 2015, the parties are REQUIRED to enter an election regarding the exercise of dispositive jurisdiction by a magistrate judge pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c) no later than 10/31/2019. In the absence of consent by all parties, the Clerk is hereby DIRECTED to reassign the case to a district judge without further order after 10/31/2019. A telephone status conference is hereby SET for 10:15 a.m. on 10/16/2019. The parties are DIRECTED to call 877-873-8017 to access the telephone conference. The access code is 4577302. The telephone conference will be cancelled if all forms are submitted twenty-four hours in advance. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H England, III on 9/16/2019. (AFS)
September 16, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE REGARDING CONSENT of a magistrate judge in a civil action. (AFS)
September 16, 2019 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint by Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company The.(AFS)
September 16, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure by Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company The (AFS)
September 16, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company The from Circuit Court of Shelby County, Alabama, case number 58-cv-2019-900893.00., filed by The Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A part 1, #2 Exhibit A part 2)(AFS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Goldberg v. Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dan A Goldberg
Represented By: Wendy L Williams
Represented By: Samantha L Carnley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company, The
Represented By: Candace H Newton
Represented By: Margaret C Philips
Represented By: Joel S Isenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?