Pettaway v. Ivey et al (INMATE 2)
Plaintiff: Len Pettaway
Defendant: Kay Ivey, Christopher Gordy and Jefferson S Dunn
Case Number: 2:2019cv01538
Filed: September 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Office: Southern Office
Presiding Judge: John H England
Referring Judge: Madeline Hughes Haikala
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petition (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 16, 2019 Filing 6 Case transferred in from District of Alabama Middle; Case Number 2:19-cv-00497. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
September 16, 2019 Case transferred to Northern District Alabama. Electronically transferred via CM/ECF transfer to Clerk. (djy, ) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 9/16/2019.]
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER ADOPTING #3 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION of the Magistrate Judge and this case is TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Alabama under 28 U.S.C. 1404(a). Signed by Chief Judge Emily C. Marks on 9/16/19. (djy, ) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 9/16/2019.]
August 14, 2019 No objections filed to the #3 Recommendation. (No pdf attached to this entry) (kr, ) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 9/16/2019.]
August 5, 2019 Filing 4 Response to Order re #3 Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge by Len Pettaway. (kr, ) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 9/16/2019.]
July 23, 2019 Filing 3 RECOMMENDATION OF THE MAGISTRATE JUDGE: it is the RECOMMENDATION of the Magistrate Judge this case be TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Alabama under 28 U.S.C. 1404(a); Objections to R&R due by 8/6/2019. Signed by Honorable Judge Wallace Capel, Jr on 7/23/2019. (kr, ) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 9/16/2019.]
July 15, 2019 Filing 2 Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit by Len Pettaway. (bes, ) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 9/16/2019.]
July 15, 2019 Filing 1 Inmate 1983 COMPLAINT against Jefferson S. Dunn, Christopher Gordy, Kay Ivey, filed by Len Pettaway. (Attachments: #1 Unsworn Declarations)(bes, ) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 9/16/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pettaway v. Ivey et al (INMATE 2)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Len Pettaway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kay Ivey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Gordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jefferson S Dunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?