Arnold v. BBH SBMC LLC et al
Plaintiff: Mary Arnold
Defendant: Tenet Health Care Corporation, BBH SBMC LLC and BBH SBMC LLC doing business as Shelby Baptist Medical Center
Case Number: 2:2019cv01545
Filed: September 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: John E Ott
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 15, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mary Arnold. BBH SBMC LLC served on 11/4/2019, answer due 11/25/2019. (KAM)
November 13, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mary Arnold. Tenet Health Care Corporation served on 11/5/2019, answer due 11/26/2019. (KAM)
November 4, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to BBH SBMC LLC, Tenet Health Care Corporation mailed certified mail (KAM)
September 18, 2019 Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number B4601100676 credit card receipt #1126-3436576 (KAM)
September 17, 2019 Filing 2 Request for service by certified mail filed by Mary Arnold. (Attachments: #1 request)(KAM)
September 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against BBH SBMC LLC, Tenet Health Care Corporation, filed by Mary Arnold.(KAM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Arnold v. BBH SBMC LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tenet Health Care Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BBH SBMC LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BBH SBMC LLC doing business as Shelby Baptist Medical Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Arnold
Represented By: Shay Samples
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?