CD Norberg & Associates Inc v. GS Administrators Inc
Plaintiff: CD Norberg & Associates Inc
Defendant: GS Administrators Inc
Case Number: 2:2019cv01592
Filed: September 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Gray M Borden
Referring Judge: Madeline Hughes Haikala
2 Judge: Anna M Manasco
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 32 SCHEDULING ORDER: Certain deadlines apply as further set out within including: Discovery due February 18, 2021, Dispositive Motions due March 19, 2021, Trial ready June 2021. The parties shall file a joint status report on or before March 1, 2021. A Status Conference is set for Monday, March 8, 2021 at 11:30 a.m., Courtroom 4B, Hugo L. Black Courthouse.. Signed by Judge Anna M Manasco on 6/30/20. (MRR, )
June 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 31 REPLACEMENT INITIAL ORDER Governing All Further Proceedings - Appendices I and II attached. This order governs all further proceedings in this case. Signed by Judge Anna M Manasco on 6/30/20. (MRR, )
June 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 30 PROTECTIVE ORDER Concerning Confidential Matters w/Exhibit A, attached. Signed by Judge Anna M Manasco on 6/8/2020. (FNC)
June 5, 2020 Filing 29 Joint MOTION for Protective Order by GS Administrators Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Protective Order)(Ramey, Shaun)
June 3, 2020 Filing 28 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT - The above-styled civil action has been reassigned to the Honorable Anna M. Manasco. Please use case number 2:19-1592-AMM on all subsequent pleadings. (KEK)
May 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 SECOND AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 2/18/2021. Dispositive motions due by 3/19/2021. Status Conference reset for Monday, 3/8/2021 at 11:00 AM, CR 7B, Hugo L Black US Courthouse, Birmingham, AL. Signed by Judge Madeline Hughes Haikala on 5/11/2020. (YMB)
May 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 STANDING ORDER FOR CIVIL CASES PENDING BEFORE JUDGE HAIKALA. Signed by Judge Madeline Hughes Haikala on 5/4/2020. (KEK)
April 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: The Court grants the parties' joint motion for extension of time. (Doc. #24 ). Discovery due by 1/4/2021. Dispositive motions due by 1/29/2021. Status Conference reset for Monday, 1/11/2021 at 11:00 AM, CR 7B, Hugo L Black US Courthouse, Birmingham, AL. Signed by Judge Madeline Hughes Haikala on 4/14/2020. (YMB)
April 14, 2020 Filing 24 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by GS Administrators Inc. (Ramey, Shaun)
March 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 STANDING ORDER FOR CIVIL CASES PENDING BEFORE JUDGE HAIKALA. Signed by Judge Madeline Hughes Haikala on 3/25/2020. (KEK)
February 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 10/2/2020. Dispositive motions due by 10/30/2020. Status Conference set for Tuesday, 10/13/2020 at 11:00 AM, CR 7B, Hugo L Black US Courthouse, Birmingham, AL. See Order for other deadlines and directives. Signed by Judge Madeline Hughes Haikala on 2/14/2020. (YMB)
February 13, 2020 Filing 21 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Ramey, Shaun)
February 6, 2020 Filing 20 ANSWER to Counterclaim by CD Norberg & Associates Inc.(Ingram, Jeffrey)
January 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER denying #8 Motion to Remand to State Court. For the reasons stated during the January 30, 2020 telephone conference in this matter, the Court denies CD Norberg's motion to remand. (Doc. #8 ). The Court asks the parties to please propose scheduling deadlines within 14 days. Signed by Judge Madeline Hughes Haikala on January 30, 2020. (Haikala, Madeline)
January 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 TEXT ORDER: TEXT ORDER: GS Administrators has removed this action on the basis of diversity jurisdiction, 28 U.S.C. 1332. (Doc. #1 ). CD Norberg has moved to remand this action to state court, arguing that the amount in controversy does not exceed the $75,000 jurisdictional threshold. (Doc. #8 ). The Court sets this matter for a telephone conference on January 30, 2020 at 3:00 p.m. Counsel of record shall please dial (877) 810-9415 and enter code 5036215 to participate in the call. Telephone Conference set for 1/30/2020 03:00 PM before Judge Madeline Hughes Haikala. Signed by Judge Madeline Hughes Haikala on 1/27/2020. (ZTC)
November 5, 2019 Filing 17 RESPONSE in Opposition re #8 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by GS Administrators Inc. (Ramey, Shaun)
November 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 TEXT ORDER: The Court grants GS Administrators' unopposed motion for extension of time. (Doc. #15 ). GS Administrators may file a response to CD Norberg's motion to remand on or before November 8, 2019. Signed by Judge Madeline Hughes Haikala on 11/1/2019. (YMB)
November 1, 2019 Filing 15 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time by GS Administrators Inc. (Reeves, T)
October 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 TEXT ORDER: The Court grants GS Administrator's Unopposed Motion for Extension. (Doc. #12 ). GS Administrators may file a response to CD Norberg's motion to remand on or before November 1, 2019. Signed by Judge Madeline Hughes Haikala on 10/18/2019. (YMB)
October 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 TEXT ORDER: The Court grants the parties' consent motion to stay Rule 26(f) obligations until after the Court rules on the pending motion to remand. (Doc. #9 ). Signed by Judge Madeline Hughes Haikala on 10/18/2019. (YMB)
October 18, 2019 Filing 12 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time by GS Administrators Inc. (Ramey, Shaun)
October 17, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #8 MOTION to Remand to State Court. GS Administrators Response due on or before October 25, 2019. (JLC)
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 TEXT ORDER: Plaintiff CD Norberg & Associates has moved to remand this action to state court. (Doc. 8). GS Administrators may file a response to CD Norberg's motion on or before October 25, 2019. Signed by Judge Madeline Hughes Haikala on 10/17/2019. (JLC)
October 11, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against CD Norberg & Associates Inc by GS Administrators Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Ramey, Shaun)
October 11, 2019 Filing 9 Consent MOTION to Stay Rule 26(f) Requirements by CD Norberg & Associates Inc. (Ingram, Jeffrey)
October 11, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Remand to State Court by CD Norberg & Associates Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(Ingram, Jeffrey)
October 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 INITIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge Madeline Hughes Haikala on 10/9/2019. (KEK)
October 7, 2019 Filing 6 Notice of Reassignment- Because the parties have not unanimously consented to the dispositive jurisdiction by a Magistrate Judge, the above styled civil action has been randomly reassigned to the Honorable Madeline Hughes Haikala. Please use case number 2:19-cv-1592-MHH on all subsequent pleadings. Magistrate Judge Gray M Borden no longer assigned to the case. (MRR, )
October 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 TEXT ORDER granting #4 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gray M. Borden on 10/3/2019. (KMAW)
October 2, 2019 Filing 4 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time by GS Administrators Inc. (Reeves, T)
September 27, 2019 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-3443488 (B4601100847). related document #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Shelby County, case number 58-cv-2019-900879., filed by GS Administrators Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 1-1 and 1-2, # 3 Exhibit 2)(MRR, ). (Reeves, T) Modified on 9/27/2019 (MRR, ).
September 26, 2019 Filing 3 Evidentiary Material re: #1 Notice of Removal Exhibit 3. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Part 2 of Exhibit 3)(Reeves, T)
September 26, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE REGARDING CONSENT to magistrate judge jurisdiction (MRR, )
September 26, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Shelby County, case number 58-cv-2019-900879., filed by GS Administrators Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 1-1 and 1-2, #3 Exhibit 2)(MRR, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CD Norberg & Associates Inc v. GS Administrators Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CD Norberg & Associates Inc
Represented By: Jeffrey L Ingram
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GS Administrators Inc
Represented By: Shaun K Ramey
Represented By: T Dylan Reeves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?