Smith v. Enhanced Recovery Company LLC
Plaintiff: Misty Smith
Defendant: Enhanced Recovery Company, LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv01593
Filed: September 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: John H England
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 TEXT ORDER: Plaintiff has indicated this matter is settled, but that the settlement requires approval from the bankruptcy court. Accordingly, Plaintiff is DIRECTED to file a status report by January 2, 2020, unless she has filed a notice of dismissal prior to that date. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H. England, III on 10/25/2019. (CDG)
October 25, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE by Misty Smith (Philipps, David)
October 15, 2019 Filing 9 Summons Returned Executed by Misty Smith. Enhanced Recovery Company, LLC served on 10/9/2019, answer due 10/30/2019. (AKD)
October 4, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Enhanced Recovery Company, LLC mailed certified mail. (AKD)
October 3, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Bradford W Botes on behalf of Misty Smith (Botes, Bradford)
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ORDER granting #3 Motion to Admit Pro Hac Vice attorneys David J. Philipps and Mary E. Philipps, but with the understanding and on the condition they pay the applicable fee and register for e-filing and notification within 14 days, unless they have already done so. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H England, III on 9/27/2019. (AVC)
September 27, 2019 PHV Fee paid: $75, receipt number 1126-3443822 ALND B4601100871). (Philipps, David)
September 27, 2019 PHV Fee paid: $75, receipt number 1126-3443816 (ALND B4601100870). (Philipps, David)
September 27, 2019 Filing Fee: $400, receipt_number 1126-3443814 (ALND B4601100869).(Philipps, David)
September 27, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE REGARDING CONSENT of a magistrate judge in a civil action. (AFS)
September 27, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE Consent to Local Service of Bradford W. Botes by Misty Smith (AFS)
September 27, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of David J. Philipps and Mary E. Philipps by Misty Smith. (AFS)
September 27, 2019 Filing 2 Request for service by certified mail filed by Misty Smith. (AFS)
September 27, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Enhanced Recovery Company LLC, filed by Misty Smith. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(AFS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. Enhanced Recovery Company LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Misty Smith
Represented By: Bradford W Botes
Represented By: David J. Philipps
Represented By: Mary Elizabeth Philipps
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Enhanced Recovery Company, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?