Hall v. Allstate Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Ricardo Hall
Defendant: Allstate Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2019cv01627
Filed: October 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: John E Ott
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCHEDULING ORDER:certain time limits apply as set out; Discovery due by 7/31/2020; Dispositive Motions due by 8/14/2020; Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Ott on 11/4/2019. (BST, )
November 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 INITIAL ORDER; Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Ott on 11/1/2019. (BST, )
November 1, 2019 Filing 7 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Ricardo Hall, Allstate Insurance Company; the telephone conference set for 11/4/19 is cancelled. (BST, )
November 1, 2019 Filing 6 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Bazemore, Thomas)
October 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER that the parties are reminded that this case will be reassigned to a district judge on 11/18/2019 unless they unanimously consent to jurisdiction by the undersigned magistrate; Telephone Conference set for 11/4/2019 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge John E Ott; parties to call in as directed; if all parties submit an executed form 24 hours in advance, the telephone conference will be cancelled; Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Ott on 10/4/2019. (BST, )
October 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER regarding compliance with Rule 26; Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 11/8/2019; Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Ott on 10/4/2019. (BST, )
October 4, 2019 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-3449281. related document #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Allstate Insurance Company from Jefferson County Circuit Court - Bessemer Division, case number 68-cv2019-900739., filed by Allstate Insurance Company. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(KAM). (Bazemore, Thomas)
October 3, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure by Allstate Insurance Company (KAM)
October 3, 2019 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Allstate Insurance Company.(KAM)
October 3, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Allstate Insurance Company from Jefferson County Circuit Court - Bessemer Division, case number 68-cv2019-900739., filed by Allstate Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(KAM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hall v. Allstate Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allstate Insurance Company
Represented By: Thomas E Bazemore, III
Represented By: Kimberly Sharron Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ricardo Hall
Represented By: Jon B Terry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?