Liveoak v. Loancare LLC et al
Plaintiff: Thomas Blake Liveoak
Defendant: Lakeview Loan Servicing LLC and Loancare LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv01641
Filed: October 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Gray M Borden
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 FINAL ORDER - Consistent with the accompanying memorandum opinion, the court GRANTS Defendants Loancare, LLC, and Lakeview Loan Servicing, LLC's unopposed motion to dismiss the complaint and DISMISSES the complaint WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Annemarie Carney Axon on 11/8/2019. (KEK)
November 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MEMORANDUM OPINION - The court WILL GRANT Defendants' motion to dismiss the complaint and WILL DISMISS the complaint WITHOUT PREJUDICE. (Doc. #4 ). The court will enter a separate order consistent with this opinion. Signed by Judge Annemarie Carney Axon on 11/8/2019. (KEK)
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TEXT ORDER re #4 MOTION to Dismiss - Plaintiff's Response is due on or before October 30, 2019; replies, if any, are due on or before November 6, 2019. Signed by Judge Annemarie Carney Axon on 10/16/19. (SAC)
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 INITIAL ORDER GOVERNING ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS - with appendices attached. Signed by Judge Annemarie Carney Axon on 10/16/19. (SAC)
October 14, 2019 Filing 5 Brief re #4 MOTION to Dismiss . (Reeves, T)
October 14, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss by Lakeview Loan Servicing LLC, Loancare LLC. (Reeves, T)
October 10, 2019 Filing 3 Notice of Reassignment- Because the parties have not unanimously consented to the dispositive jurisdiction by a Magistrate Judge, the above styled civil action has been randomly reassigned to the Honorable Annemarie Carney Axon. Please use case number 2:19-cv-1641-ACA on all subsequent pleadings. Magistrate Judge Gray M Borden no longer assigned to the case. (MRR, )
October 8, 2019 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-3451601 (B4601101164). related document #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Lakeview Loan Servicing LLC, Loancare LLC from Circuit Court of Jefferson County, case number 01-cv-2019-903615., filed by Lakeview Loan Servicing LLC, Loancare LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5)(MRR, ). (Bottcher, Christopher) Modified on 10/9/2019 (MRR, ).
October 8, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE REGARDING CONSENT to magistrate judge jurisdiction (MRR, )
October 7, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Lakeview Loan Servicing LLC, Loancare LLC from Circuit Court of Jefferson County, case number 01-cv-2019-903615., filed by Lakeview Loan Servicing LLC, Loancare LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(MRR, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Liveoak v. Loancare LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lakeview Loan Servicing LLC
Represented By: Christopher A Bottcher
Represented By: T Dylan Reeves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Loancare LLC
Represented By: Christopher A Bottcher
Represented By: T Dylan Reeves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Blake Liveoak
Represented By: T Blake Liveoak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?