Momentum Capital Funding LLC et al v. Enhanced Energy Holdings LLC et al
Plaintiff: Momentum Capital Funding LLC and Momentum Equipment & Supply LLC
Defendant: Enhanced Energy Holdings LLC, Michael E Yates and Vapor Oilfield Services LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv01644
Filed: October 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Gray M Borden
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 12, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Returned Unexecuted as to Michael E Yates. (MRR, )
November 12, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Returned Unexecuted as to Enhanced Energy Holdings LLC. (MRR, )
November 12, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure by Momentum Capital Funding LLC, Momentum Equipment & Supply LLC (Pereyda, Christian)
November 7, 2019 Filing 5 Alias Summons Issued as to Enhanced Energy Holdings LLC, Vapor Oilfield Services LLC, Michael E Yates, returned to pltf for service (MRR, )
November 1, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Returned Unexecuted as to Vapor Oilfield Services LLC. (MRR, )
October 10, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants, sent via certified mail (MRR, )
October 9, 2019 Request for service by certified mail within the body of the complaint filed by Momentum Capital Funding LLC, Momentum Equipment & Supply LLC. (MRR, )
October 8, 2019 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-3452387 (B4601101173). related document #1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Momentum Equipment & Supply LLC, Momentum Capital Funding LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O, # 16 Exhibit P)(MRR, ). (Pereyda, Christian) Modified on 10/9/2019 (MRR, ).
October 8, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE REGARDING CONSENT to magistrate judge jurisdiction (MRR, )
October 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Momentum Equipment & Supply LLC, Momentum Capital Funding LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P)(MRR, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Momentum Capital Funding LLC et al v. Enhanced Energy Holdings LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Momentum Capital Funding LLC
Represented By: Christian Antonio Pereyda
Represented By: John Leland Murphree
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Momentum Equipment & Supply LLC
Represented By: Christian Antonio Pereyda
Represented By: John Leland Murphree
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Enhanced Energy Holdings LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael E Yates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vapor Oilfield Services LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?