Safeco Insurance Company of America v. McInnis
Plaintiff: Safeco Insurance Company of America
Defendant: Crawford McInnis
Case Number: 2:2019cv01648
Filed: October 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: John H England
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 5, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge John H England, III: Telephone Conference held on 12/5/2019; Attorney J. Hess present by phone for pltf; Attorney C. Kirby present by phone for dft; consent procedure discussed; conf. adj. (AVC)
November 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REGARDING COMPLIANCE WITH RULE 26(f) Signed by Magistrate Judge John H England, III on 11/05/2019. (AKD)
November 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER - Pursuant to the General Order For Referral of Civil Matters to the United States Magistrate Judges of the Northern District of Alabama, dated January 2, 2015, the parties are REQUIRED to enter an election regarding the exercise of dispositive jurisdiction by a magistrate judge pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c) no later than December 20, 2019. In the absence of consent by all parties, the Clerk is hereby DIRECTED to reassign the case to a district judge without further order after December 20, 2019 . A telephone status conference is hereby SET for December 5, 2019 at 10:30 am. The parties are DIRECTED to call 877-873-8017 to access the telephone conference. The access code is 4577302. The telephone conference will be cancelled if all forms are submitted twenty-four hours in advance. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H England, III on 11/05/2019. (AKD)
November 5, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Crawford McInnis.(Kirby, Cason)
October 15, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Safeco Insurance Company of America. Crawford McInnis served on 10/12/2019, answer due 11/2/2019. (AKD)
October 10, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Crawford McInnis mailed certified mail. (AKD)
October 10, 2019 Filing 6 ***Document Sealed** Notice of filing Exhibit 1 under seal (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (KAM)
October 10, 2019 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-3454005 (ALND receipt# B4601101230). related document #1 COMPLAINT against Crawford McInnis, filed by Safeco Insurance Company of America. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 2, # 2 Exhibit 3)(KEK). (Baker, Joshua) Modified on 10/10/2019 (AKD, ).
October 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #2 Motion to Seal Exibit 1Signed by Magistrate Judge John H England, III on 10/09/2019. (AKD)
October 9, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE REGARDING CONSENT of a magistrate judge in a civil action. (KEK)
October 9, 2019 Filing 3 Request for service by certified mail filed by Safeco Insurance Company of America. (KEK)
October 9, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to File Exhibit 1 Under Seal by Safeco Insurance Company of America. (KEK)
October 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Crawford McInnis, filed by Safeco Insurance Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2, #2 Exhibit 3)(KEK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Safeco Insurance Company of America v. McInnis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crawford McInnis
Represented By: Cason M Kirby
Represented By: Andrew Phillip Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Safeco Insurance Company of America
Represented By: Joshua B Baker
Represented By: Joshua R Hess
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?