Rustin v. Nissan North America Inc
Plaintiff: Lori Rustin
Defendant: Nissan North America Inc
Case Number: 2:2019cv01651
Filed: October 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: R David Proctor
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 21, 2019 Filing 5 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Strubel, J)
November 1, 2019 Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number B4601101738 (KAM)
October 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 INITIAL ORDER - with appendices attached. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 10/10/2019. (KAM)
October 9, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Nissan North America Inc. filed by Nissan North America Inc (Strubel, J)
October 9, 2019 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Nissan North America Inc.(Strubel, J)
October 9, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Nissan North America Inc from Jefferson County Circuit Court, case number 2019-903997., filed by Nissan North America Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A 1-4, #2 Exhibit A 5-13, #3 Exhibit B)(KAM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rustin v. Nissan North America Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lori Rustin
Represented By: Michael Parrish
Represented By: Thomas C. Donald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nissan North America Inc
Represented By: J Patrick Strubel
Represented By: Austin Katherine Smith Sistrunk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?