McWane Inc v. Liberty Coating Company LLC
Plaintiff: McWane Inc
Defendant: Liberty Coating Company LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv01673
Filed: October 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Staci G Cornelius
Nature of Suit: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 09:1
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 18, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius: Status Conference held on 11/18/2019; attys James McDaniel and James Harris, III present by telephone; conf adj. (chambers) (MSN)
November 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT ORDER: A telephone status conference is currently set for 11:00 a.m. on November 18, 2019. (Doc. #8 ). The parties are REMINDED that the status conference will be cancelled by separate order if, prior to the date of the conference, all parties submit forms indicating whether they consent to magistrate judge jurisdiction. Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 11/13/2019. (MSN)
November 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER - Pursuant to the General Order For Referral of Civil Matters to the United States Magistrate Judges of the Northern District of Alabama, dated January 2, 2015, the parties are REQUIRED to enter an election regarding the exercise of dispositive jurisdiction by a magistrate judge pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c) no later than December 19, 2019. In the absence of consent by all parties, the Clerk is hereby DIRECTED to reassign the case to a district judge without further order after December 19, 2019. A telephone status conference is hereby SET for 11:00 a.m. on November 18, 2019. The parties are DIRECTED to call 877-336-1831 to access the telephone conference. The access code is 2778178. The telephone conference will be cancelled if all forms are submitted twenty-four hours in advance. Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 11/6/19. (MRR, )
November 4, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure by Liberty Coating Company LLC (Harris, James)
November 4, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Liberty Coating Company LLC.(Harris, James)
October 15, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by McWane Inc. McWane Inc served on 10/14/2019, answer due 11/4/2019. (McDaniel, James)
October 11, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Liberty Coating Company LLC., returned to pltf for service (MRR, )
October 11, 2019 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-3455356 (B4601101266). related document #1 COMPLAINT- Petition for Order to Compel Arbitration against Liberty Coating Company LLC, filed by McWane Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit A1, # 3 Exhibit A2, # 4 Exhibit A3, # 5 Exhibit A4, # 6 Exhibit B, # 7 Exhibit C, # 8 Exhibit D)(MRR, ) Modified text on 10/11/2019 (MRR, ).. (McDaniel, James) Modified on 10/11/2019 (MRR, ).
October 11, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by McWane Inc. filed by McWane Inc (McDaniel, James)
October 11, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE REGARDING CONSENT to magistrate judge jurisdiction (MRR, )
October 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT- Petition for Order to Compel Arbitration against Liberty Coating Company LLC, filed by McWane Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit A1, #3 Exhibit A2, #4 Exhibit A3, #5 Exhibit A4, #6 Exhibit B, #7 Exhibit C, #8 Exhibit D)(MRR, ) Modified text on 10/11/2019 (MRR, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McWane Inc v. Liberty Coating Company LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Coating Company LLC
Represented By: James A Harris, III
Represented By: Nicole Mapp Hardee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: McWane Inc
Represented By: James Conrad Lester
Represented By: James Ethan McDaniel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?