Mixon v. Diversicare of Riverchase LLC
Plaintiff: Marquetta Mixon
Defendant: Diversicare of Riverchase LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv01695
Filed: October 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Gray M Borden
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2003
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 TEXT ORDER granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant shall file its response to the complaint on or before February 17, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gray M Borden on 12/06/2019. (RCP)
December 6, 2019 Filing 4 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Marquetta Mixon. (Jackson, Sidney)
October 30, 2019 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Marquetta Mixon. Diversicare of Riverchase LLC waiver sent on 10/18/2019, answer due 12/17/2019. (Jackson, Sidney)
October 21, 2019 Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number B4601101423. (KEK)
October 17, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE REGARDING CONSENT to magistrate judge jurisdiction (MRR, )
October 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Diversicare of Riverchase LLC, filed by Marquetta Mixon.(MRR, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mixon v. Diversicare of Riverchase LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diversicare of Riverchase LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marquetta Mixon
Represented By: Samuel Fisher
Represented By: Sidney Monroe Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?