Cunningham v. Professional Wiregrass Communications Inc et al
Plaintiff: Renay Cunningham
Defendant: Professional Wiregrass Communications Inc and Douglas E Lindley
Case Number: 2:2019cv01752
Filed: October 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: John H England
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 29, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Douglas E Lindley and Professional Wiregrass Communications Inc. mailed certified mail. (AKD) Modified on 10/29/2019 (AKD, )
October 28, 2019 Filing Fee received in the amount of $400.00, Credit Card receipt_number 1126-3465804, NDAL receipt #B4601101631. (Camp, Robert) Modified on 10/28/2019 (JLC).
October 28, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE REGARDING CONSENT of a magistrate judge in a civil action. (KEK)
October 25, 2019 Filing 2 Request for service by certified mail filed by Renay Cunningham. (KEK)
October 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Douglas E Lindley, Professional Wiregrass Communications Inc, filed by Renay Cunningham.(KEK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cunningham v. Professional Wiregrass Communications Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Professional Wiregrass Communications Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Douglas E Lindley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Renay Cunningham
Represented By: Robert J Camp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?