Johnson v. G Robin Pruitt Jr DMD PC et al
Plaintiff: Brittney Johnson
Defendant: Magic City Dentistry PC and G Robin Pruitt Jr DMD PC
Case Number: 2:2019cv01768
Filed: October 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Annemarie Carney Axon
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 INITIAL ORDER GOVERNING ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS - with appendices attached. Signed by Judge Annemarie Carney Axon on 11/27/19. (SAC)
November 27, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by G Robin Pruitt Jr DMD PC, Magic City Dentistry PC.(Gray, John)
November 8, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Brittney Johnson. G Robin Pruitt Jr DMD PC served on 11/6/2019, answer due 11/27/2019; Magic City Dentistry PC served on 11/6/2019, answer due 11/27/2019. (KEK)
November 4, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to G Robin Pruitt Jr DMD PC, Magic City Dentistry PC. Sent via certified mail. (KEK)
October 30, 2019 Filing 2 Request for service by certified mail filed by Brittney Johnson. (Porter, Adam)
October 30, 2019 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-3468095 (ALND B4601101672) related document #1 COMPLAINT against G Robin Pruitt Jr DMD PC, Magic City Dentistry PC, filed by Brittney Johnson.(KEK). (Porter, Adam) Modified on 11/1/2019 (KEK).
October 29, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against G Robin Pruitt Jr DMD PC, Magic City Dentistry PC, filed by Brittney Johnson.(KEK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. G Robin Pruitt Jr DMD PC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Magic City Dentistry PC
Represented By: John W Gray, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G Robin Pruitt Jr DMD PC
Represented By: John W Gray, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brittney Johnson
Represented By: Adam M Porter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?