Green v. Blount County, Alabama et al
Plaintiff: Megan C Green
Defendant: Mark Moon and Blount County, Alabama
Case Number: 2:2019cv01838
Filed: November 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: John E Ott
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 29:2601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 10, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen Keith Woodall on behalf of Megan C Green (Woodall, Stephen)
January 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 INITIAL ORDER; Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Ott on 1/9/2020. (BST, )
January 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER that the telephone conference set for 1/8/20 is cancelled; Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Ott on 1/7/2020. (BST, )
January 7, 2020 Filing 12 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Mark Moon, Megan C Green, Blount County, Alabama. (BST, )
January 7, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE to remind parties of consent telephone conference scheduled for 11:00 AM on Wednesday, 1/8/20; if all parties submit an executed consent form, either consenting or declining magistrate judge jurisdiction, by 9:00 AM, 1/8/20, the conference will be cancelled. (BST)
December 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER that the parties are reminded that this case will be reassigned to a district judge on 1/23/20 unless they unanimously consent to jurisdiction by the undersigned magistrate judge; Telephone Conference set for 1/8/2020 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge John E Ott; parties to call in a directed; if all parties submit an executed form 24 hours in advance, the telephone conference will be cancelled; Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Ott on 12/13/2019. (BST)
December 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER regarding compliance with Rule 26; Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 1/17/2020; Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Ott on 12/13/2019. (BST, )
December 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT ORDER granting #7 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to Extend Briefing Deadlines in re #5 Defendants' motion to dismiss. Plaintiff opposition or other response shall now be due by January 13, 2020; Defendants may reply by January 23, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E. Ott on 12/11/2019.(SJB)
December 10, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Continue Motion is RIPE 12/10/2019. Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion.Filed by Megan C Green. (Dawson, William)
December 10, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #5 MOTION to Dismiss . Responses due by 1/3/2020 Replies due by 1/13/2020. (KAM)
December 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT SUBMISSION ORDER re #5 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Defendants Mark Moon and Blount County, Alabama. Plaintiff shall file any opposition or other response to the motion to dismiss by January 3, 2020. Defendants may reply by January 13, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E. Ott on 12/10/2019. (SJB)
December 9, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss by Blount County, Alabama, Mark Moon. (Lockwood, Robert)
November 19, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Megan C Green. Blount County, Alabama served on 11/18/2019, answer due 12/9/2019; Mark Moon served on 11/18/2019, answer due 12/9/2019. (KAM)
November 14, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Blount County, Alabama, Mark Moon mailed certified mail (KAM)
November 13, 2019 Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number B4601102027 (KAM)
November 12, 2019 Filing 2 Request for service by certified mail filed by Megan C Green. (KAM)
November 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Blount County, Alabama, Mark Moon, filed by Megan C Green.(KAM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Green v. Blount County, Alabama et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Megan C Green
Represented By: William M Dawson
Represented By: Stephen Keith Woodall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Moon
Represented By: Robert C Lockwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blount County, Alabama
Represented By: Robert C Lockwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?