Lee v. Blue Cross Blue Shield of Alabama
Plaintiff: Emily C Lee
Defendant: Blue Cross Blue Shield of Alabama
Case Number: 2:2019cv01895
Filed: November 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: John H England
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 eri
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 17, 2020 Filing 14 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Emily C Lee, filed by Emily C Lee.(Wyatt, J)
January 17, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge John H England, III: Discovery Hearing held on 1/17/2020; Attorney A. Wyatt present for pltf; Attorneys E. Flachsbart and C. Kimble present for dft; hrg adj. (Court Reporter Sabrina Lewis) (AVC)
January 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 TEXT ORDER: The hearing set for Thursday, January 16, 2020 is RESET for Friday, January 17, 2020 at 10:00 a.m. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H. England, III on 1/9/2020. (CDG, )
January 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER re #9 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. The report indicates that the parties dispute whether discovery should be permitted in this action. (Id. at 2). That matter is set for hearing on Thursday, January 16, 2020, at 10:30 AM at the Hugo L. Black United States Courthouse, 1729 5th Avenue North, Birmingham, AL 35203 in Courtroom 3A. A court reporter will be present. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H England, III on 01/08/2020. (AKD)
January 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 INITIAL ORDER GOVERNING ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H England, III on 01/08/2020. (AKD)
January 8, 2020 Filing 10 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge (AKD)
January 6, 2020 Filing 9 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Flachsbart, Elizabeth)
January 6, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge John H England, III: Telephone Conference held on 1/6/2020; Attorney A. Wyatt present by phone for pltf; Attorney C. Kimble present by phone for dft; consent procedure discussed; conf adj. (AVC)
December 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REGARDING COMPLIANCE WITH RULE 26(f). Signed by Magistrate Judge John H England, III on 12/02/2019. (AKD)
December 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER - Pursuant to the General Order For Referral of Civil Matters to the United States Magistrate Judges of the Northern District of Alabama, dated January 2, 2015, the parties are REQUIRED to enter an election regarding the exercise of dispositive jurisdiction by a magistrate judge pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c) no later than January 17, 2020. In the absence of consent by all parties, the Clerk is hereby DIRECTED to reassign the case to a district judge without further order after January 17, 2020. A telephone status conference is hereby SET for January 6, 2020 at 10:00 am. The parties are DIRECTED to call 877-873-8017 to access the telephone conference. The access code is 4577302. The telephone conference will be cancelled if all forms are submitted twenty-four hours in advance. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H England, III on 12/02/2019. (AKD)
November 27, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by Blue Cross Blue Shield of Alabama.(Flachsbart, Elizabeth)
November 22, 2019 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Blue Cross Blue Shield of Alabama. filed by Blue Cross Blue Shield of Alabama (Flachsbart, Elizabeth)
November 22, 2019 Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number B4601102232. (KEK)
November 21, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Emily C Lee. (Wyatt, J)
November 21, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Cavender C Kimble on behalf of Blue Cross Blue Shield of Alabama (Kimble, Cavender)
November 21, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE REGARDING CONSENT to a Magistrate Judge in a civil action. (AKD)
November 21, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Blue Cross Blue Shield of Alabama from Jefferson County District Court, case number 01-DV-2019-906025.00 filed by Blue Cross Blue Shield of Alabama. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(AKD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lee v. Blue Cross Blue Shield of Alabama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emily C Lee
Represented By: Mark W Lee
Represented By: J Alex Wyatt, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blue Cross Blue Shield of Alabama
Represented By: Elizabeth Jones Flachsbart
Represented By: Cavender C Kimble
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?