Helms et al v. CAPTRUST Financial Advisors LLC
Plaintiff: Meredith Helms and Wesley R Helms
Defendant: CAPTRUST Financial Advisors LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv02082
Filed: December 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Gray M Borden
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER- The parties filed a joint stipulation of dismissal that complies with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41. (Doc. #9 ). Accordingly, this matter is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE, each party to bear its own costs. Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii). Signed by Magistrate Judge Gray M Borden on 2/4/20. (MRR, )
February 4, 2020 Filing 9 STIPULATION of Dismissal JOINT STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL by Meredith Helms, Wesley R Helms. filed by Meredith Helms, Wesley R Helms (Thompson, Charles)
January 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER - Pursuant to the General Order For Referral of Civil Matters to the United States Magistrate Judges of the Northern District of Alabama, dated January 2, 2015, the parties are REQUIRED to enter an election regarding the exercise of dispositive jurisdiction by a magistrate judge pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c) no later than March 6, 2020. In the absence of consent by all parties, the Clerk is hereby DIRECTED to reassign the case to a district judge without further order after March 6, 2020. A telephone status conference is hereby SET for 11:00 a.m. on February 19, 2020. The parties are DIRECTED to call 888-636-3807 to access the telephone conference. The access code is 3676046. The telephone conference will be cancelled if all forms are submitted twenty-four hours in advance. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gray M Borden on 1/21/20. (MRR, )
January 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TEXT ORDER re: #5 Motion to Compel Arbitration. Plaintiffs shall file a response to the motion on or before 2/4/2020, and Defendant may file a reply on or before 2/11/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gray M Borden on 1/21/2020. (KMAW)
January 21, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure by CAPTRUST Financial Advisors LLC (Jackson, Stephen)
January 21, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION to Compel Arbitration by CAPTRUST Financial Advisors LLC. (Jackson, Stephen)
January 21, 2020 REMOVED Docs 5 and 6 for filing errors- MOTION to Compel Arbitration by CAPTRUST Financial Advisors LLC. (Jackson, Stephen);MOTION for Disclosure Corporate Disclosure Statement by CAPTRUST Financial Advisors LLC. (Jackson, Stephen) (MRR, )
January 7, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed CAPTRUST Financial Advisors LLC served (no date entered on green card)(MRR, )
December 26, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to CAPTRUST Financial Advisors LLC. mailed certified mail. (AKD)
December 23, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE REGARDING CONSENT to magistrate judge jurisdiction (MRR, )
December 23, 2019 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-3502086 (B4601102875). related document #1 COMPLAINT against CAPTRUST Financial Advisors LLC, filed by Wesley R Helms, Meredith Helms.(MRR, ). (Thompson, Charles) Modified on 12/27/2019 (MRR, ).
December 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CAPTRUST Financial Advisors LLC, filed by Wesley R Helms, Meredith Helms.(MRR, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Helms et al v. CAPTRUST Financial Advisors LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Meredith Helms
Represented By: Charles M Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wesley R Helms
Represented By: Charles M Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CAPTRUST Financial Advisors LLC
Represented By: Stephen C Jackson
Represented By: Thomas J Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?