Horsley v. Birmingham, City of et al
Plaintiff: Gary Michael Horsley
Defendant: Mayor Randall Woodfin and Birmingham, City of
Case Number: 2:2019cv02087
Filed: December 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Office: Southern Office
Presiding Judge: Staci G Cornelius
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 651
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER OF DISMISSAL- A motion for dismissal has been filed in this action before the opposing parties served either an answer or a motion for summary judgment (Doc #3 ); It is ORDERED, ADJUDGED, and DECREED that this matter is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE, costs taxed as paid FED. R. CIV. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i).. Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 1/16/20. (MRR, )
January 15, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint by Gary Michael Horsley. (Morro, Scott)
December 26, 2019 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-3503311 (ALND reciept# B4601102939). related document #1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Gary Michael Horsley. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit)(MRR, ). (Morro, Scott) Modified on 12/26/2019 (AKD, ).
December 23, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE REGARDING CONSENT to magistrate judge jurisdiction (MRR, )
December 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Gary Michael Horsley. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(MRR, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Horsley v. Birmingham, City of et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mayor Randall Woodfin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Birmingham, City of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Michael Horsley
Represented By: Scott Thomas Morro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?