Ard et al v. Wal-Mart Stores Inc
Plaintiff: Felisha Toney, Connie Waldrop, Patricia Johnson, Sue Newman, Mae-Francis Griffin, Dorothea Martin Pears, Patricia Deese, Lanika Saunders, Stacy Nielsen, Mary Landry, Annette Williams, Crystal Young, Jocelyn "Joyce&quo Williams, Debra Prescott, Deana Cotton, Katherine Sims, Lue Smedley, Belinda Becoat-Rogers, Debra Flake, Niki Tucker, Alma Odom, Diana McCord, Carol Kopacz, Debra Shealey, Debra Gilbert, Tristen Harris, Betty Ruth Cooper, Yolanda Taite-Bryant, Sherlia Phillips, Shonna Nettles, Tracy Wright, Stephanie Carrington, Willie Mae Shelley, Penny Sullivan, Tammy Tuggle, Barbara Dawson, Carolyn Love, Thelma Matthews, Alfreda Irving, Thearesa Collier, Yolanda Christian, Bonnie Spadaro, Brittany Johnson, Shavonya Byrd, Tammy Ard, Natalie Thomas, Elsie Williams, Carol Gonzales, Pamela Young, Petrina Howard, Joann Magee and Jocelyn Joyce Williams
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores Inc
Case Number: 2:2019cv02100
Filed: December 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Office: Southern Office
Presiding Judge: John E Ott
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 TEXT ORDER finding as moot #6 Motion to Dismiss, in light of #20 Amended Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E. Ott on 2/20/2020. (SJB)
February 18, 2020 Filing 20 AMENDED COMPLAINT Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint against defendant, filed by Tammy Ard.(Wiggins, Robert) Modified on 2/19/2020 (KAM, ).
February 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #18 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Docs. #5 and #6 . Plaintiffs' Response due by 2/21/2020; Defendants may reply by 2/28/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E. Ott on 2/12/2020. (SJB)
February 12, 2020 Filing 18 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #5 MOTION to Sever Plaintiffs' Claims and Memorandum of Law in Support Thereof, #6 MOTION to Dismiss (Partial) and Memorandum of Law in Support Thereof Plaintiffs' Motion for Seven Day Extension to Brief Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss and Motion to Sever Motion is RIPE 2/12/2020. Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion.Filed by Tammy Ard. (Wiggins, Robert)
February 11, 2020 Filing 17 REPLY to Response to Motion re #7 MOTION to Stay Discovery and Memorandum in Support Thereof filed by Wal-Mart Stores Inc. (Bradford, Stacey)
February 5, 2020 Filing 16 CORRECTED RESPONSE to re #7 Plainifffs' Opposition To Motion to Stay Discovery filed by Tammy Ard, Belinda Becoat-Rogers, Shavonya Byrd, Stephanie Carrington, Yolanda Christian, Thearesa Collier, Betty Ruth Cooper, Deana Cotton, Barbara Dawson, Patricia Deese, Debra Flake, Debra Gilbert, Carol Gonzales, Mae-Francis Griffin, Tristen Harris, Petrina Howard, Alfreda Irving, Brittany Johnson, Patricia Johnson, Carol Kopacz, Mary Landry, Carolyn Love, Joann Magee, Thelma Matthews, Diana McCord, Shonna Nettles, Sue Newman, Stacy Nielsen, Alma Odom, Dorothea Martin Pears, Sherlia Phillips, Debra Prescott, Lanika Saunders, Debra Shealey, Willie Mae Shelley, Katherine Sims, Lue Smedley, Bonnie Spadaro, Penny Sullivan, Yolanda Taite-Bryant, Natalie Thomas, Felisha Toney, Niki Tucker, Tammy Tuggle, Connie Waldrop, Annette Williams, Elsie Williams, Jocelyn Joyce Williams, Tracy Wright, Crystal Young, Pamela Young. (Wiggins, Robert) Modified on 2/6/2020 (KAM, ).
February 5, 2020 Filing 15 RESPONSE in Opposition re #7 MOTION to Stay Discovery and Memorandum in Support Thereof Plaintiffs' Opposition To Motion To Stay Discovery filed by Tammy Ard, Belinda Becoat-Rogers, Shavonya Byrd, Stephanie Carrington, Yolanda Christian, Thearesa Collier, Betty Ruth Cooper, Deana Cotton, Barbara Dawson, Patricia Deese, Debra Flake, Debra Gilbert, Carol Gonzales, Mae-Francis Griffin, Tristen Harris, Petrina Howard, Alfreda Irving, Brittany Johnson, Patricia Johnson, Carol Kopacz, Mary Landry, Carolyn Love, Joann Magee, Thelma Matthews, Diana McCord, Shonna Nettles, Sue Newman, Stacy Nielsen, Alma Odom, Dorothea Martin Pears, Sherlia Phillips, Debra Prescott, Lanika Saunders, Debra Shealey, Willie Mae Shelley, Katherine Sims, Lue Smedley, Bonnie Spadaro, Penny Sullivan, Yolanda Taite-Bryant, Natalie Thomas, Felisha Toney, Niki Tucker, Tammy Tuggle, Connie Waldrop, Annette Williams, Elsie Williams, Jocelyn Joyce Williams, Tracy Wright, Crystal Young, Pamela Young. (Wiggins, Robert) Filed in error Modified on 2/6/2020 (KAM, ).
February 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER that the parties are reminded that this case will be reassigned to a district judge on 3/16/2020 unless they unanimously consent to jurisdiction by the undersigned magistrate; Telephone Conference set for 3/2/2020 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge John E. Ott; parties to call in as directed; if all parties submit an executed form 24 hours in advance, the telephone conference will be cancelled; Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Ott on 2/5/2020. (BST, )
February 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER regarding compliance with Rule 26; Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 3/11/2020; Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Ott on 2/5/2020. (BST, )
February 3, 2020 Set Deadlines as to #6 MOTION to Dismiss (Partial) and Memorandum of Law in Support Thereof, #5 MOTION to Sever Plaintiffs' Claims and Memorandum of Law in Support Thereof. Responses due by 2/14/2020 Replies due by 2/21/2020. (KAM)
January 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 TEXT ORDER re #7 MOTION to Stay Discovery filed by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. Plaintiff shall file any opposition or other response to the motion by February 5, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E. Ott on 1/31/2020. (SJB)
January 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 TEXT SUBMISSION ORDER re #5 MOTION to Sever filed by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. and #6 MOTION to Dismiss in Part filed by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. Plaintiffs shall file any opposition or other response to the motions by February 14, 2020; Wal-Mart may reply by February 21, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E. Ott on 1/31/2020. (SJB)
January 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 TEXT ORDER granting #9 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E. Ott on 1/31/2020. (SJB)
January 30, 2020 PHV Fee paid: $ 75, receipt number 1126-3526019. (Bradford, Stacey)
January 30, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Scott A. Forman Motion is RIPE 1/30/2020. Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion.Filed by Wal-Mart Stores Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Scott Forman, #2 Exhibit B - Certificates of Good Standing)(Bradford, Stacey)
January 30, 2020 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Wal-Mart Stores Inc. filed by Wal-Mart Stores Inc (Bradford, Stacey)
January 30, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION to Stay Discovery and Memorandum in Support Thereof by Wal-Mart Stores Inc. (Bradford, Stacey)
January 30, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss (Partial) and Memorandum of Law in Support Thereof by Wal-Mart Stores Inc. (Bradford, Stacey)
January 30, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION to Sever Plaintiffs' Claims and Memorandum of Law in Support Thereof by Wal-Mart Stores Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Plfs' Employment Summary, #2 Exhibit B - Chart of Plfs' Allegations, #3 Exhibit C - Chart of Alleged Policies)(Bradford, Stacey)
January 13, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tammy Ard. All Defendants. (Wiggins, Robert)
January 7, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Wal-Mart Stores Inc. delivered to plaintiff for service (KAM)
January 3, 2020 Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number B4601102967 (KAM)
January 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 TEXT ORDER. This action was filed on December 23, 2019. The docket sheet does not indicate, however, that Plaintiffs have paid the filing fee or filed an application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. See 28 U.S.C. Secs. 1914, 1915. Plaintiffs are ordered to do one or the other by January 8, 2020. Failure to comply will render this action subject to dismissal for want of prosecution without further notice. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E. Ott on 1/03/2020.(SJB)
December 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Wal-Mart Stores Inc, filed by Diana McCord, Thelma Matthews, Mae-Francis Griffin, Patricia Johnson, Patricia Deese, Tammy Ard, Debra Flake, Joann Magee, Barbara Dawson, Lue Smedley, Elsie Williams, Carol Kopacz, Brittany Johnson, Mary Landry, Crystal Young, Lanika Saunders, Betty Ruth Cooper, Carol Gonzales, Felisha Toney, Alfreda Irving, Shavonya Byrd, Dorothea Martin Pears, Sue Newman, Stephanie Carrington, Jocelyn "Joyce&quo Williams, Natalie Thomas, Willie Mae Shelley, Tristen Harris, Penny Sullivan, Thearesa Collier, Petrina Howard, Carolyn Love, Niki Tucker, Debra Prescott, Stacy Nielsen, Tammy Tuggle, Belinda Becoat-Rogers, Pamela Young, Debra Shealey, Yolanda Christian, Yolanda Taite-Bryant, Deana Cotton, Connie Waldrop, Sherlia Phillips, Shonna Nettles, Tracy Wright, Bonnie Spadaro, Alma Odom, Katherine Sims, Debra Gilbert, Annette Williams.(KAM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ard et al v. Wal-Mart Stores Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Felisha Toney
Represented By: Lieselotte Carmen-Burks
Represented By: Candis A McGowan
Represented By: Rocco Calamusa, Jr
Represented By: Kameron Monet Buckner
Represented By: Jon C Goldfarb
Represented By: Robert L Wiggins, Jr
Represented By: Ann K Wiggins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Connie Waldrop
Represented By: Lieselotte Carmen-Burks
Represented By: Candis A McGowan
Represented By: Rocco Calamusa, Jr
Represented By: Kameron Monet Buckner
Represented By: Jon C Goldfarb
Represented By: Robert L Wiggins, Jr
Represented By: Ann K Wiggins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Johnson
Represented By: Lieselotte Carmen-Burks
Represented By: Candis A McGowan
Represented By: Rocco Calamusa, Jr
Represented By: Kameron Monet Buckner
Represented By: Jon C Goldfarb
Represented By: Robert L Wiggins, Jr
Represented By: Ann K Wiggins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sue Newman
Represented By: Lieselotte Carmen-Burks
Represented By: Candis A McGowan
Represented By: Rocco Calamusa, Jr
Represented By: Kameron Monet Buckner
Represented By: Jon C Goldfarb
Represented By: Robert L Wiggins, Jr
Represented By: Ann K Wiggins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mae-Francis Griffin
Represented By: Lieselotte Carmen-Burks
Represented By: Candis A McGowan
Represented By: Rocco Calamusa, Jr
Represented By: Kameron Monet Buckner
Represented By: Jon C Goldfarb
Represented By: Robert L Wiggins, Jr
Represented By: Ann K Wiggins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dorothea Martin Pears
Represented By: Lieselotte Carmen-Burks
Represented By: Candis A McGowan
Represented By: Rocco Calamusa, Jr
Represented By: Kameron Monet Buckner
Represented By: Jon C Goldfarb
Represented By: Robert L Wiggins, Jr
Represented By: Ann K Wiggins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Deese
Represented By: Lieselotte Carmen-Burks
Represented By: Candis A McGowan
Represented By: Rocco Calamusa, Jr
Represented By: Kameron Monet Buckner
Represented By: Jon C Goldfarb
Represented By: Robert L Wiggins, Jr
Represented By: Ann K Wiggins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lanika Saunders
Represented By: Lieselotte Carmen-Burks
Represented By: Candis A McGowan
Represented By: Rocco Calamusa, Jr
Represented By: Kameron Monet Buckner
Represented By: Jon C Goldfarb
Represented By: Robert L Wiggins, Jr
Represented By: Ann K Wiggins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stacy Nielsen
Represented By: Lieselotte Carmen-Burks
Represented By: Candis A McGowan
Represented By: Rocco Calamusa, Jr
Represented By: Kameron Monet Buckner
Represented By: Jon C Goldfarb
Represented By: Robert L Wiggins, Jr
Represented By: Ann K Wiggins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Landry
Represented By: Lieselotte Carmen-Burks
Represented By: Candis A McGowan
Represented By: Rocco Calamusa, Jr
Represented By: Kameron Monet Buckner
Represented By: Jon C Goldfarb
Represented By: Robert L Wiggins, Jr
Represented By: Ann K Wiggins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Annette Williams
Represented By: Lieselotte Carmen-Burks
Represented By: Candis A McGowan
Represented By: Rocco Calamusa, Jr
Represented By: Kameron Monet Buckner
Represented By: Jon C Goldfarb
Represented By: Robert L Wiggins, Jr
Represented By: Ann K Wiggins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Crystal Young
Represented By: Lieselotte Carmen-Burks
Represented By: Candis A McGowan
Represented By: Rocco Calamusa, Jr
Represented By: Kameron Monet Buckner
Represented By: Jon C Goldfarb
Represented By: Robert L Wiggins, Jr
Represented By: Ann K Wiggins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jocelyn "Joyce&quo Williams
Represented By: Lieselotte Carmen-Burks
Represented By: Candis A McGowan
Represented By: Rocco Calamusa, Jr
Represented By: Kameron Monet Buckner
Represented By: Jon C Goldfarb
Represented By: Robert L Wiggins, Jr
Represented By: Ann K Wiggins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debra Prescott
Represented By: Lieselotte Carmen-Burks
Represented By: Candis A McGowan
Represented By: Rocco Calamusa, Jr
Represented By: Kameron Monet Buckner
Represented By: Jon C Goldfarb
Represented By: Robert L Wiggins, Jr
Represented By: Ann K Wiggins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deana Cotton
Represented By: Lieselotte Carmen-Burks
Represented By: Candis A McGowan
Represented By: Rocco Calamusa, Jr
Represented By: Kameron Monet Buckner
Represented By: Jon C Goldfarb
Represented By: Robert L Wiggins, Jr
Represented By: Ann K Wiggins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Katherine Sims
Represented By: Lieselotte Carmen-Burks
Represented By: Candis A McGowan
Represented By: Rocco Calamusa, Jr
Represented By: Kameron Monet Buckner
Represented By: Jon C Goldfarb
Represented By: Robert L Wiggins, Jr
Represented By: Ann K Wiggins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lue Smedley
Represented By: Lieselotte Carmen-Burks
Represented By: Candis A McGowan
Represented By: Rocco Calamusa, Jr
Represented By: Kameron Monet Buckner
Represented By: Jon C Goldfarb
Represented By: Robert L Wiggins, Jr
Represented By: Ann K Wiggins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Belinda Becoat-Rogers
Represented By: Lieselotte Carmen-Burks
Represented By: Candis A McGowan
Represented By: Rocco Calamusa, Jr
Represented By: Kameron Monet Buckner
Represented By: Jon C Goldfarb
Represented By: Robert L Wiggins, Jr
Represented By: Ann K Wiggins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debra Flake
Represented By: Lieselotte Carmen-Burks
Represented By: Candis A McGowan
Represented By: Rocco Calamusa, Jr
Represented By: Kameron Monet Buckner
Represented By: Jon C Goldfarb
Represented By: Robert L Wiggins, Jr
Represented By: Ann K Wiggins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Niki Tucker
Represented By: Lieselotte Carmen-Burks
Represented By: Candis A McGowan
Represented By: Rocco Calamusa, Jr
Represented By: Kameron Monet Buckner
Represented By: Jon C Goldfarb
Represented By: Robert L Wiggins, Jr
Represented By: Ann K Wiggins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alma Odom
Represented By: Lieselotte Carmen-Burks
Represented By: Candis A McGowan
Represented By: Rocco Calamusa, Jr
Represented By: Kameron Monet Buckner
Represented By: Jon C Goldfarb
Represented By: Robert L Wiggins, Jr
Represented By: Ann K Wiggins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diana McCord
Represented By: Lieselotte Carmen-Burks
Represented By: Candis A McGowan
Represented By: Rocco Calamusa, Jr
Represented By: Kameron Monet Buckner
Represented By: Jon C Goldfarb
Represented By: Robert L Wiggins, Jr
Represented By: Ann K Wiggins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carol Kopacz
Represented By: Lieselotte Carmen-Burks
Represented By: Candis A McGowan
Represented By: Rocco Calamusa, Jr
Represented By: Kameron Monet Buckner
Represented By: Jon C Goldfarb
Represented By: Robert L Wiggins, Jr
Represented By: Ann K Wiggins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debra Shealey
Represented By: Lieselotte Carmen-Burks
Represented By: Candis A McGowan
Represented By: Rocco Calamusa, Jr
Represented By: Kameron Monet Buckner
Represented By: Jon C Goldfarb
Represented By: Robert L Wiggins, Jr
Represented By: Ann K Wiggins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debra Gilbert
Represented By: Lieselotte Carmen-Burks
Represented By: Candis A McGowan
Represented By: Rocco Calamusa, Jr
Represented By: Kameron Monet Buckner
Represented By: Jon C Goldfarb
Represented By: Robert L Wiggins, Jr
Represented By: Ann K Wiggins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tristen Harris
Represented By: Lieselotte Carmen-Burks
Represented By: Candis A McGowan
Represented By: Rocco Calamusa, Jr
Represented By: Kameron Monet Buckner
Represented By: Jon C Goldfarb
Represented By: Robert L Wiggins, Jr
Represented By: Ann K Wiggins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Betty Ruth Cooper
Represented By: Lieselotte Carmen-Burks
Represented By: Candis A McGowan
Represented By: Rocco Calamusa, Jr
Represented By: Kameron Monet Buckner
Represented By: Jon C Goldfarb
Represented By: Robert L Wiggins, Jr
Represented By: Ann K Wiggins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yolanda Taite-Bryant
Represented By: Lieselotte Carmen-Burks
Represented By: Candis A McGowan
Represented By: Rocco Calamusa, Jr
Represented By: Kameron Monet Buckner
Represented By: Jon C Goldfarb
Represented By: Robert L Wiggins, Jr
Represented By: Ann K Wiggins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sherlia Phillips
Represented By: Lieselotte Carmen-Burks
Represented By: Candis A McGowan
Represented By: Rocco Calamusa, Jr
Represented By: Kameron Monet Buckner
Represented By: Jon C Goldfarb
Represented By: Robert L Wiggins, Jr
Represented By: Ann K Wiggins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shonna Nettles
Represented By: Lieselotte Carmen-Burks
Represented By: Candis A McGowan
Represented By: Rocco Calamusa, Jr
Represented By: Kameron Monet Buckner
Represented By: Jon C Goldfarb
Represented By: Robert L Wiggins, Jr
Represented By: Ann K Wiggins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tracy Wright
Represented By: Lieselotte Carmen-Burks
Represented By: Candis A McGowan
Represented By: Rocco Calamusa, Jr
Represented By: Kameron Monet Buckner
Represented By: Jon C Goldfarb
Represented By: Robert L Wiggins, Jr
Represented By: Ann K Wiggins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephanie Carrington
Represented By: Lieselotte Carmen-Burks
Represented By: Candis A McGowan
Represented By: Rocco Calamusa, Jr
Represented By: Kameron Monet Buckner
Represented By: Jon C Goldfarb
Represented By: Robert L Wiggins, Jr
Represented By: Ann K Wiggins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Willie Mae Shelley
Represented By: Lieselotte Carmen-Burks
Represented By: Candis A McGowan
Represented By: Rocco Calamusa, Jr
Represented By: Kameron Monet Buckner
Represented By: Jon C Goldfarb
Represented By: Robert L Wiggins, Jr
Represented By: Ann K Wiggins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Penny Sullivan
Represented By: Lieselotte Carmen-Burks
Represented By: Candis A McGowan
Represented By: Rocco Calamusa, Jr
Represented By: Kameron Monet Buckner
Represented By: Jon C Goldfarb
Represented By: Robert L Wiggins, Jr
Represented By: Ann K Wiggins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tammy Tuggle
Represented By: Lieselotte Carmen-Burks
Represented By: Candis A McGowan
Represented By: Rocco Calamusa, Jr
Represented By: Kameron Monet Buckner
Represented By: Jon C Goldfarb
Represented By: Robert L Wiggins, Jr
Represented By: Ann K Wiggins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara Dawson
Represented By: Lieselotte Carmen-Burks
Represented By: Candis A McGowan
Represented By: Rocco Calamusa, Jr
Represented By: Kameron Monet Buckner
Represented By: Jon C Goldfarb
Represented By: Robert L Wiggins, Jr
Represented By: Ann K Wiggins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carolyn Love
Represented By: Lieselotte Carmen-Burks
Represented By: Candis A McGowan
Represented By: Rocco Calamusa, Jr
Represented By: Kameron Monet Buckner
Represented By: Jon C Goldfarb
Represented By: Robert L Wiggins, Jr
Represented By: Ann K Wiggins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thelma Matthews
Represented By: Lieselotte Carmen-Burks
Represented By: Candis A McGowan
Represented By: Rocco Calamusa, Jr
Represented By: Kameron Monet Buckner
Represented By: Jon C Goldfarb
Represented By: Robert L Wiggins, Jr
Represented By: Ann K Wiggins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alfreda Irving
Represented By: Lieselotte Carmen-Burks
Represented By: Candis A McGowan
Represented By: Rocco Calamusa, Jr
Represented By: Kameron Monet Buckner
Represented By: Jon C Goldfarb
Represented By: Robert L Wiggins, Jr
Represented By: Ann K Wiggins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thearesa Collier
Represented By: Lieselotte Carmen-Burks
Represented By: Candis A McGowan
Represented By: Rocco Calamusa, Jr
Represented By: Kameron Monet Buckner
Represented By: Jon C Goldfarb
Represented By: Robert L Wiggins, Jr
Represented By: Ann K Wiggins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yolanda Christian
Represented By: Lieselotte Carmen-Burks
Represented By: Candis A McGowan
Represented By: Rocco Calamusa, Jr
Represented By: Kameron Monet Buckner
Represented By: Jon C Goldfarb
Represented By: Robert L Wiggins, Jr
Represented By: Ann K Wiggins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bonnie Spadaro
Represented By: Lieselotte Carmen-Burks
Represented By: Candis A McGowan
Represented By: Rocco Calamusa, Jr
Represented By: Kameron Monet Buckner
Represented By: Jon C Goldfarb
Represented By: Robert L Wiggins, Jr
Represented By: Ann K Wiggins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brittany Johnson
Represented By: Lieselotte Carmen-Burks
Represented By: Candis A McGowan
Represented By: Rocco Calamusa, Jr
Represented By: Kameron Monet Buckner
Represented By: Jon C Goldfarb
Represented By: Robert L Wiggins, Jr
Represented By: Ann K Wiggins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shavonya Byrd
Represented By: Lieselotte Carmen-Burks
Represented By: Candis A McGowan
Represented By: Rocco Calamusa, Jr
Represented By: Kameron Monet Buckner
Represented By: Jon C Goldfarb
Represented By: Robert L Wiggins, Jr
Represented By: Ann K Wiggins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tammy Ard
Represented By: Lieselotte Carmen-Burks
Represented By: Candis A McGowan
Represented By: Rocco Calamusa, Jr
Represented By: Kameron Monet Buckner
Represented By: Jon C Goldfarb
Represented By: Robert L Wiggins, Jr
Represented By: Ann K Wiggins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Natalie Thomas
Represented By: Lieselotte Carmen-Burks
Represented By: Candis A McGowan
Represented By: Rocco Calamusa, Jr
Represented By: Kameron Monet Buckner
Represented By: Jon C Goldfarb
Represented By: Robert L Wiggins, Jr
Represented By: Ann K Wiggins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elsie Williams
Represented By: Lieselotte Carmen-Burks
Represented By: Candis A McGowan
Represented By: Rocco Calamusa, Jr
Represented By: Kameron Monet Buckner
Represented By: Jon C Goldfarb
Represented By: Robert L Wiggins, Jr
Represented By: Ann K Wiggins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carol Gonzales
Represented By: Lieselotte Carmen-Burks
Represented By: Candis A McGowan
Represented By: Rocco Calamusa, Jr
Represented By: Kameron Monet Buckner
Represented By: Jon C Goldfarb
Represented By: Robert L Wiggins, Jr
Represented By: Ann K Wiggins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pamela Young
Represented By: Lieselotte Carmen-Burks
Represented By: Candis A McGowan
Represented By: Rocco Calamusa, Jr
Represented By: Kameron Monet Buckner
Represented By: Jon C Goldfarb
Represented By: Robert L Wiggins, Jr
Represented By: Ann K Wiggins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Petrina Howard
Represented By: Lieselotte Carmen-Burks
Represented By: Candis A McGowan
Represented By: Rocco Calamusa, Jr
Represented By: Kameron Monet Buckner
Represented By: Jon C Goldfarb
Represented By: Robert L Wiggins, Jr
Represented By: Ann K Wiggins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joann Magee
Represented By: Lieselotte Carmen-Burks
Represented By: Candis A McGowan
Represented By: Rocco Calamusa, Jr
Represented By: Kameron Monet Buckner
Represented By: Jon C Goldfarb
Represented By: Robert L Wiggins, Jr
Represented By: Ann K Wiggins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jocelyn Joyce Williams
Represented By: Lieselotte Carmen-Burks
Represented By: Candis A McGowan
Represented By: Rocco Calamusa, Jr
Represented By: Kameron Monet Buckner
Represented By: Jon C Goldfarb
Represented By: Robert L Wiggins, Jr
Represented By: Ann K Wiggins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores Inc
Represented By: Scott A Forman
Represented By: Stacey T Bradford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?