Wells Fargo Bank National Association v. Chance et al
Plaintiff: Wells Fargo Bank National Association
Defendant: Connie Virgadamo, Judith A Chance, Jack L Rowe, Charles Barnard, Frank A Virgadamo, Karen L McElliott and B Renee Barnard
Case Number: 2:2019cv02120
Filed: December 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: R David Proctor
Nature of Suit: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 21, 2020 Filing 35 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,,,, and Cross-Motion to Vacate or Deem the Arbitration Awards Invalid or Unenforceable by Karen L McElliott(as Trustee of Trust B under the Ronald Joseph and Karen Lee McElliot 1984 Family Trust dated 8/4/1984), Karen L McElliott(as Trustee of the Ronald Joseph and Karen Lee McElliott 1984 Family Trust dated 8/4/1984), Karen L McElliott(as Trustee of Trust C under the Ronald Joseph and Karen Lee McEllliot 1984 Family Trust dated 8/4/1984), Karen L McElliott(individually), Karen L McElliott(as Trustee of Trust A under the Ronald Joseph and Karen Lee McElliot 1984 Family Trust dated 8/4/1984). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - November 2019 email, #2 Exhibit B - December 2019 email)(Hammond, Clark)
February 21, 2020 Filing 34 Summons Returned Unexecuted by Wells Fargo Bank National Association as to Frank A Virgadamo (individually). (KAM)
February 21, 2020 Filing 33 Summons Returned Unexecuted by Wells Fargo Bank National Association as to Connie Virgadamo. (KAM)
February 19, 2020 Filing 32 Summons Returned Unexecuted by Wells Fargo Bank National Association as to Charles Barnard(as Trustee of The Barnard Living Trust dated 4/13/2000). (KAM)
February 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 31 TEXT ORDER After the court issued its Order setting a status conference on March 2, 2020 at 2:00 p.m. #29 , Clark R. Hammond appeared as counsel for Defendants Judith A. Chance and Jack L. Rowe. In light of this, Mr. Hammond SHALL appear before the court at this status conference. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 2/19/2020. (KAM)
February 18, 2020 Filing 30 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,,,, and Cross Motion to Vacate or Deem the Arbitration Awards Invalid or Unenforceable by Judith A Chance(as Trustee of The Chance Family Trust under Declaration of Trust dated 2/16/1988, Trust No. 2), Judith A Chance(as Trustee of Chance Survivor's Trust under Declaration of Trust dated 2/16/1988, Trust No. 2), Judith A Chance(individually ), Judith A Chance(as Trustee of the Declaration of Trust dated 2/16/1988, Trust No. 2), Jack L Rowe(individually), Jack L Rowe(as Trustee of the Jack and Barbara Rowe Family Trust UTD 4/21/1998). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Hammond, Clark) Modified on 2/19/2020 (KAM, ).
February 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER Status Conference set for 3/2/2020 02:00 PM before Judge R David Proctor.. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 2/14/2020. (KAM)
February 13, 2020 Filing 28 Alias Summons Issued as to B Renee Barnard(as Trustee of The Barnard Living Trust dated 4/13/2000), B Renee Barnard(individually), Charles Barnard(individually), Charles Barnard(as Trustee of The Barnard Living Trust dated 4/13/2000) delivered to plaintiff for service (KAM)
February 13, 2020 Filing 27 Alias Summons Issued 2/11/2020as to B Renee Barnard(as Trustee of The Barnard Living Trust dated 4/13/2000) delivered to plaintiff for service. (KAM)
February 13, 2020 Filing 26 MOTION for Service by Publication by Wells Fargo Bank National Association. (Hahn, W)
February 13, 2020 Filing 25 MOTION for Service by Publication by Wells Fargo Bank National Association. (Hahn, W)
February 13, 2020 Filing 24 MOTION to Amend/Correct #18 MOTION for Service by Publication on Karen McElliott by Wells Fargo Bank National Association. (Hahn, W)
February 11, 2020 Filing 23 Alias Summons Issued as to B Renee Barnard(as Trustee of The Barnard Living Trust dated 4/13/2000), B Renee Barnard(individually), Charles Barnard(individually), Charles Barnard(as Trustee of The Barnard Living Trust dated 4/13/2000) delivered to plaintiff for service. (KAM)
February 10, 2020 Filing 22 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Wells Fargo Bank National Association. Karen L McElliott(as Trustee of Trust B under the Ronald Joseph and Karen Lee McElliot 1984 Family Trust dated 8/4/1984) served on 2/10/2020, answer due 3/2/2020. (KAM)
February 6, 2020 Filing 21 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Wells Fargo Bank National Association. Karen L McElliott(individually) served on 2/6/2020, answer due 2/27/2020. ( green card signed, not dated) (KAM)
February 5, 2020 Filing 20 Alias Summons Issued as to B Renee Barnard(individually), Charles Barnard(individually), Connie Virgadamo, Frank A Virgadamo (as Trustee of The Virgadamo Family Trust), Frank A Virgadamo (individually) delivered to plaintiff for service (KAM)
February 4, 2020 Filing 19 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Wells Fargo Bank National Association. Karen L McElliott(as Trustee of Trust C under the Ronald Joseph and Karen Lee McEllliot 1984 Family Trust dated 8/4/1984) served on 2/4/2020, answer due 2/25/2020. (green card signed but not dated) (KAM)
February 4, 2020 Filing 18 MOTION for Service by Publication on Karen McElliott by Wells Fargo Bank National Association. (Hahn, W)
February 4, 2020 Filing 17 Summons Returned Unexecuted by Wells Fargo Bank National Association as to B Renee Barnard(individually). (KAM)
February 3, 2020 Filing 16 Summons Returned Unexecuted by Wells Fargo Bank National Association as to Charles Barnard(individually). (KAM)
January 31, 2020 Filing 15 Alias Summons Issued as to B Renee Barnard(individually), Charles Barnard(individually), Charles Barnard(as Trustee of The Barnard Living Trust dated 4/13/2000), Karen L McElliott(as Trustee of Trust B under the Ronald Joseph and Karen Lee McElliot 1984 Family Trust dated 8/4/1984), Karen L McElliott(as Trustee of the Ronald Joseph and Karen Lee McElliott 1984 Family Trust dated 8/4/1984), Karen L McElliott(as Trustee of Trust C under the Ronald Joseph and Karen Lee McEllliot 1984 Family Trust dated 8/4/1984), Karen L McElliott(individually), Karen L McElliott(as Trustee of Trust A under the Ronald Joseph and Karen Lee McElliot 1984 Family Trust dated 8/4/1984), Connie Virgadamo, Frank A Virgadamo (as Trustee of The Virgadamo Family Trust), Frank A Virgadamo (individually) mailed certified mail (KAM)
January 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 TEXT ORDER This matter is before the court on Defendants Notice of Bankruptcy #4 . Plaintiff responded to Defendants Notice on January 14, 2020. Defendants SHALL reply to Plaintiffs response on or before February 12, 2020. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 1/29/2020. (KAM)
January 29, 2020 Filing 13 Request for service by certified mail filed by Wells Fargo Bank National Association. (Hahn, W)
January 29, 2020 Filing 12 Request for service by certified mail filed by Wells Fargo Bank National Association. (Hahn, W)
January 23, 2020 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Wells Fargo Bank National Association. (Hahn, W)
January 23, 2020 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Wells Fargo Bank National Association. Jack L Rowe(individually) served on 1/22/2020, answer due 2/12/2020. (Hahn, W)
January 21, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Wells Fargo Bank National Association. (Hahn, W)
January 21, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Wells Fargo Bank National Association. (Hahn, W)
January 21, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Wells Fargo Bank National Association. (Hahn, W)
January 21, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Wells Fargo Bank National Association. Judith A Chance(as Trustee of The Chance Family Trust under Declaration of Trust dated 2/16/1988, Trust No. 2) served on 1/12/2020, answer due 2/2/2020. (Hahn, W)
January 14, 2020 Filing 5 RESPONSE to re #4 Response to Defendants' Notice of Bankruptcy Filing and Imposition of the Automatic Stay filed by Wells Fargo Bank National Association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Hahn, W)
January 10, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE by B Renee Barnard(as Trustee of The Barnard Living Trust dated 4/13/2000), B Renee Barnard(individually), Charles Barnard(individually), Charles Barnard(as Trustee of The Barnard Living Trust dated 4/13/2000), Judith A Chance(as Trustee of The Chance Family Trust under Declaration of Trust dated 2/16/1988, Trust No. 2), Judith A Chance(as Trustee of Chance Survivor's Trust under Declaration of Trust dated 2/16/1988, Trust No. 2), Judith A Chance(individually ), Judith A Chance(as Trustee of the Declaration of Trust dated 2/16/1988, Trust No. 2), Karen L McElliott(as Trustee of Trust B under the Ronald Joseph and Karen Lee McElliot 1984 Family Trust dated 8/4/1984), Karen L McElliott(as Trustee of the Ronald Joseph and Karen Lee McElliott 1984 Family Trust dated 8/4/1984), Karen L McElliott(as Trustee of Trust C under the Ronald Joseph and Karen Lee McEllliot 1984 Family Trust dated 8/4/1984), Karen L McElliott(individually), Karen L McElliott(as Trustee of Trust A under the Ronald Joseph and Karen Lee McElliot 1984 Family Trust dated 8/4/1984), Jack L Rowe(individually), Jack L Rowe(as Trustee of the Jack and Barbara Rowe Family Trust UTD 4/21/1998), Connie Virgadamo, Frank A Virgadamo (as Trustee of The Virgadamo Family Trust), Frank A Virgadamo (individually) (Campbell, Andrew)
January 2, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants delivered to plaintiff for service (KAM)
December 30, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Wells Fargo Bank National Association. filed by Wells Fargo Bank National Association (Hahn, W)
December 27, 2019 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-3504382. related document #1 COMPLAINT against B Renee Barnard(as Trustee of The Barnard Living Trust dated 4/13/2000), B Renee Barnard(individually), Charles Barnard(individually), Charles Barnard(as Trustee of The Barnard Living Trust dated 4/13/2000), Judith A Chance(as Trustee of The Chance Family Trust under Declaration of Trust dated 2/16/1988, Trust No. 2), Judith A Chance(as Trustee of Chance Survivor's Trust under Declaration of Trust dated 2/16/1988, Trust No. 2), Judith A Chance(individually ), Judith A Chance(as Trustee of the Declaration of Trust dated 2/16/1988, Trust No. 2), Karen L McElliott(as Trustee of Trust B under the Ronald Joseph and Karen Lee McElliot 1984 Family Trust dated 8/4/1984), Karen L McElliott(as Trustee of the Ronald Joseph and Karen Lee McElliott 1984 Family Trust dated 8/4/1984), Karen L McElliott(as Trustee of Trust C under the Ronald Joseph and Karen Lee McEllliot 1984 Family Trust dated 8/4/1984), Karen L McElliott(individually), Karen L McElliott(as Trustee of Trust A under the Ronald Joseph and Karen Lee McElliot 1984 Family Trust dated 8/4/1984), Jack L Rowe(individually), Jack L Rowe(as Trustee of the Jack and Barbara Rowe Family Trust UTD 4/21/1998), Connie Virgadamo, Frank A Virgadamo (as Trustee of The Virgadamo Family Trust), Frank A Virgadamo (individually), filed by Wells Fargo Bank National Association.(KAM). (Hahn, W)
December 27, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against B Renee Barnard(as Trustee of The Barnard Living Trust dated 4/13/2000), B Renee Barnard(individually), Charles Barnard(individually), Charles Barnard(as Trustee of The Barnard Living Trust dated 4/13/2000), Judith A Chance(as Trustee of The Chance Family Trust under Declaration of Trust dated 2/16/1988, Trust No. 2), Judith A Chance(as Trustee of Chance Survivor's Trust under Declaration of Trust dated 2/16/1988, Trust No. 2), Judith A Chance(individually ), Judith A Chance(as Trustee of the Declaration of Trust dated 2/16/1988, Trust No. 2), Karen L McElliott(as Trustee of Trust B under the Ronald Joseph and Karen Lee McElliot 1984 Family Trust dated 8/4/1984), Karen L McElliott(as Trustee of the Ronald Joseph and Karen Lee McElliott 1984 Family Trust dated 8/4/1984), Karen L McElliott(as Trustee of Trust C under the Ronald Joseph and Karen Lee McEllliot 1984 Family Trust dated 8/4/1984), Karen L McElliott(individually), Karen L McElliott(as Trustee of Trust A under the Ronald Joseph and Karen Lee McElliot 1984 Family Trust dated 8/4/1984), Jack L Rowe(individually), Jack L Rowe(as Trustee of the Jack and Barbara Rowe Family Trust UTD 4/21/1998), Connie Virgadamo, Frank A Virgadamo (as Trustee of The Virgadamo Family Trust), Frank A Virgadamo (individually), filed by Wells Fargo Bank National Association.(KAM) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/30/2019: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G) (KAM, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wells Fargo Bank National Association v. Chance et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Connie Virgadamo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judith A Chance
Represented By: Clark R Hammond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jack L Rowe
Represented By: Clark R Hammond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Barnard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frank A Virgadamo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karen L McElliott
Represented By: Clark R Hammond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B Renee Barnard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wells Fargo Bank National Association
Represented By: Matthew M Cahill
Represented By: W Patton Hahn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?