McDermott v. Byers Engineering Company
Plaintiff: Leo McDermott
Defendant: Byers Engineering Company
Case Number: 2:2020cv00092
Filed: January 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Corey L Maze
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1938
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 TEXT ORDER: granting #4 Defendant's unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant Byers Engineering Company's answer is due 3/18/2020. Signed by Judge Corey L. Maze on 02/27/2020. (JPW)
February 26, 2020 Filing 4 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by Byers Engineering Company. (Kessler, Gary)
February 11, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Leo McDermott. Byers Engineering Company served on 2/5/2020, answer due 2/26/2020. (Wolinsky, Jessica)
January 31, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Byers Engineering Company delivered to plaintiff for service. (AKD)
January 21, 2020 Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number B4601103474. (KEK)
January 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Byers Engineering Company filed by Leo McDermott.(SRD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McDermott v. Byers Engineering Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leo McDermott
Represented By: Jessica Marie Wolinsky
Represented By: Anthony David Michel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Byers Engineering Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?