Alabama Rental Property LLC AG F/ Geoff Glossop v. Holloway
Plaintiff: Alabama Rental Property LLC AG F/ Geoff Glossop
Defendant: Abby Nicole Holloway
Case Number: 2:2020cv00130
Filed: January 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Staci G Cornelius
Referring Judge: R David Proctor
Nature of Suit: Rent Lease & Ejectment
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Defendant's Motion to Proceed IFP is MOOT because the case is due to be dismissed w/out prejudice for lack of subject matter jurisdiction; this case is REMANDED to the Circuit Court of Jefferson County, Alabama. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 3/3/2020. (KAM)
February 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 INITIAL ORDER - with appendices attached. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 2/28/2020. (KAM)
February 27, 2020 Filing 7 Notice of Reassignment- The above-styled civil action has been reassigned to the Honorable R. David Proctor. Please use case number 2:20-130-RDP on all subsequent pleadings. Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius no longer assigned to the case. (MRR, )
February 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER- The General Order calls for reassignment to a district judge following the occurrence of the first of three "triggering events" absent unanimous consent; None of these events have occurred in this case, and it appears that no such event will occur in a timely manner; Accordingly, the case is now due to be assigned to a district judge. Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 2/27/20. (MRR, )
February 26, 2020 Filing 5 RESPONSE to Courts Order to Show Cause Pursuant to 28 USC 1441 (B) filed by Abby Nicole Holloway. (MRR, )
February 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE- For the reasons stated within, Ms. Holloway is ORDERED to SHOW CAUSE why this matter should not be remanded to the Jefferson County District Court for lack of federal subject matter jurisdiction; The court will not rule on the pending motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis until the jurisdictional inquiry is resolved. Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 2/11/20. (MRR, )
January 28, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE REGARDING CONSENT to magistrate judge jurisdiction (MRR, )
January 28, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis Motion is RIPE 1/28/2020. Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion.Filed by Abby Nicole Holloway. (MRR, )
January 28, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Abby Nicole Holloway from Circuit Court of Jefferson County, case number 01-DV-2019-907081., filed by Abby Nicole Holloway.(MRR, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alabama Rental Property LLC AG F/ Geoff Glossop v. Holloway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abby Nicole Holloway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alabama Rental Property LLC AG F/ Geoff Glossop
Represented By: Norman G Winston, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?