Callejas Olguin v. AUM Pelham LLC et al
Plaintiff: Maria Yuridia Callejas Olguin
Defendant: AUM Pelham LLC and Rakesh Patel
Case Number: 2:2020cv00138
Filed: January 29, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: R David Proctor
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 18, 2020 Filing 7 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Armstrong, Allan)
February 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 INITIAL ORDER - with appendices attached. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 2/24/2020. (JLC)
February 21, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by AUM Pelham LLC, Rakesh Patel.(Cartwright, Darrell)
February 10, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Maria Yuridia Callejas Olguin. AUM Pelham LLC served on 2/3/2020, answer due 2/24/2020. (KAM)
February 4, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Maria Yuridia Callejas Olguin. Rakesh Patel served on 2/3/2020, answer due 2/24/2020. (KAM)
January 31, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to AUM Pelham LLC, Rakesh Patel mailed certified mail (KAM)
January 31, 2020 Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number B4601103694 (KAM)
January 29, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against AUM Pelham LLC, Rakesh Patel, filed by Maria Yuridia Callejas Olguin.(KAM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Callejas Olguin v. AUM Pelham LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AUM Pelham LLC
Represented By: Darrell L Cartwright
Represented By: Allan L Armstrong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rakesh Patel
Represented By: Darrell L Cartwright
Represented By: Allan L Armstrong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Yuridia Callejas Olguin
Represented By: Jessica Myers Vosburgh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?