Sewell v. North Hill Nursing & Rehabilitation Center LLC
Plaintiff: Beth Sewell
Defendant: North Hill Nursing & Rehabilitation Center LLC
Case Number: 2:2020cv00162
Filed: February 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Madeline Hughes Haikala
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 20, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Madeline Hughes Haikala: Telephone Conference held on 2/20/2020. (Court Reporter Leah Turner.) (YMB)
February 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER - Consistent with the discussion on the record during the February 20, 2020 telephone conference in this matter, the Court grants Ms. Sewell's motion and remands this case to the Circuit Court of Jefferson County because the removal was untimely. The Signed by Judge Madeline Hughes Haikala on 2/20/2020. (KEK)
February 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TEXT ORDER: Ms. Sewell has filed a motion to remand. (Doc. #6 ). The Court sets the motion for a telephone conference on February 20, 2020 at 11:00 a.m. Counsel of record shall please dial (877) 873-8018 and enter code 5313999. During the telephone conference, the Court shall determine whether briefs are necessary. Signed by Judge Madeline Hughes Haikala on 2/11/2020. (KEK)
February 10, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Beth Sewell. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Barnett, Steven)
February 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 INITIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge Madeline Hughes Haikala on 2/5/20. (KEK)
February 5, 2020 Filing 4 ***Document Sealed - Exhibits D & E to Notice of Removal #1 . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit D, #2 Exhibit E) (KEK)
February 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 TEXT ORDER: The Court grants defendant's motion to file documents under seal. (Doc. #2 ). If the Court determines that some or all of the information contained in the documents should not remain under seal, the Court will give the parties notice and an opportunity to be heard. Signed by Judge Madeline Hughes Haikala on 2/5/2020. (YMB)
February 5, 2020 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-3529593 (ALND B4601103828) related document #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by North Hill Nursing & Rehabilitation Center LLC from Circuit Court of Jefferson County, Alabama, case number 01-cv-2019-901653, filed by North Hill Nursing & Rehabilitation Center LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, Part 1, # 2 Exhibit A, Part 2, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F)(KEK). (Sproule, R) Modified on 2/5/2020 (KEK).
February 5, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION to Seal Document #1 Notice of Removal, Exhibits D and E to Notice of Removal by North Hill Nursing & Rehabilitation Center LLC. (Sproule, R)
February 5, 2020 ***Answer to Complaint filed 5/16/19 - See Exhibit A, Part 1, pages 21-35*** (KEK)
February 5, 2020 ***State Court Complaint filed 4/11/19 - See Exhibit A, Part 1, pages 2-9***(KEK)
February 5, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by North Hill Nursing & Rehabilitation Center LLC from Circuit Court of Jefferson County, Alabama, case number 01-cv-2019-901653, filed by North Hill Nursing & Rehabilitation Center LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, Part 1, #2 Exhibit A, Part 2, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F)(KEK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sewell v. North Hill Nursing & Rehabilitation Center LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beth Sewell
Represented By: Steven D Barnett
Represented By: Keith T Belt, Jr
Represented By: Wayne A Duke, Jr
Represented By: Robert P Bruner
Represented By: William Ryan Myers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: North Hill Nursing & Rehabilitation Center LLC
Represented By: R Gordon Sproule, Jr
Represented By: Mary Alexandra Parish
Represented By: Kimberly Sharron Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?