Joe Hand Promotions Inc v. Davis et al
Plaintiff: Joe Hand Promotions Inc
Defendant: Keith Davis and Onyx of Birmingham LLC, The
Case Number: 2:2020cv00261
Filed: February 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: R David Proctor
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:501
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 INITIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 4/13/2020. (KAM)
April 2, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Keith Davis, Onyx of Birmingham LLC, The.(KEK)
April 1, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Returned Unexecuted by Joe Hand Promotions Inc as to Keith Davis. (KAM)
March 11, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joe Hand Promotions Inc. Onyx of Birmingham LLC, The served on 3/9/2020, answer due 3/30/2020. (KAM)
February 28, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Keith Davis, Onyx of Birmingham LLC, The mailed certified mail (KAM)
February 27, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE by Joe Hand Promotions Inc (Sinor, Andrew)
February 27, 2020 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-3545527. related document #1 COMPLAINT against Keith Davis, Onyx of Birmingham LLC, The, filed by Joe Hand Promotions Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(KAM). (Sinor, Andrew)
February 27, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Joe Hand Promotions Inc. filed by Joe Hand Promotions Inc (Sinor, Andrew)
February 27, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Keith Davis, Onyx of Birmingham LLC, The, filed by Joe Hand Promotions Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(KAM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Joe Hand Promotions Inc v. Davis et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joe Hand Promotions Inc
Represented By: Andrew J Sinor, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keith Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Onyx of Birmingham LLC, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?