Wells Fargo Bank NA v. Boaz
Plaintiff: Wells Fargo Bank NA
Defendant: Roger Boaz
Case Number: 2:2020cv00306
Filed: March 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: John H England
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 31, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 31, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Protective Order TO REQUIRE COURT APPROVAL FOR ANY FUTURE PRESERVATION IMPROVEMENTS Motion is RIPE 3/31/2020. Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion.Filed by Wells Fargo Bank NA. (Reeves, T)
March 31, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION to Deposit Funds to Redeem Property by Wells Fargo Bank NA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1: Redemption Figures Provided By Defendant)(Reeves, T)
March 31, 2020 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Roger Boaz, filed by Wells Fargo Bank NA.(Reeves, T)
March 30, 2020 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Wells Fargo Bank NA. Roger Boaz waiver sent on 3/10/2020, answer due 5/23/2020. (Reeves, T)
March 30, 2020 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Roger Boaz on March 10, 2020 by Wells Fargo Bank NA. Waiver of Service due by 4/9/2020. (Reeves, T)
March 30, 2020 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Wells Fargo Bank NA. Roger Boaz waiver sent on 3/24/2020, answer due 5/23/2020. (Reeves, T)
March 6, 2020 Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number B4601104623 (AKD)
March 6, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF CONSENT to a magistate judge in a civil action. (AKD)
March 5, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Roger Boaz filed by Wells Fargo Bank NA.(AKD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wells Fargo Bank NA v. Boaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roger Boaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wells Fargo Bank NA
Represented By: T Dylan Reeves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?