Beck v. Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc et al
Plaintiff: Virgil Beck
Defendant: Pfizer Inc, GlaxoSmithKline LLC, Sanofi US Services Inc and Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc
Case Number: 2:2020cv00328
Filed: March 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: John H England
Nature of Suit: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 31, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Transferring Case to MDL: ORDER of Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation transferring this case to the Southern District of Florida for inclusion in MDL 2924; record electronically transferred to Clerk of Court in Southern District of Florida. (AKD)
March 27, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Virgil Beck. Sanofi US Services Inc served on 3/27/2020, answer due 4/17/2020 (no date on green card). (AKD)
March 25, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Virgil Beck. Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc served on 3/19/2020, answer due 4/9/2020; GlaxoSmithKline LLC served on 3/19/2020, answer due 4/9/2020; Pfizer Inc served on 3/19/2020, answer due 4/9/2020. (AKD)
March 16, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc, GlaxoSmithKline LLC, Pfizer Inc, Sanofi US Services Inc mailed certified mail. (AKD)
March 16, 2020 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-3557780 (ALND reciept# B4601104877). related document #1 COMPLAINT against Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc, GlaxoSmithKline LLC, Pfizer Inc, Sanofi US Services Inc, filed by Virgil Beck. (AKD) Modified on 3/11/2020 (AKD, ).. (Miller, Lauren) Modified on 3/17/2020 (AKD).
March 11, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF CONSENT to a magistrate judge in a civil action (AKD)
March 10, 2020 Filing 2 Request for service by certified mail filed by Virgil Beck. (AKD)
March 10, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc, GlaxoSmithKline LLC, Pfizer Inc, Sanofi US Services Inc, filed by Virgil Beck. (AKD) Modified on 3/11/2020 (AKD, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Beck v. Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pfizer Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GlaxoSmithKline LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanofi US Services Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Virgil Beck
Represented By: Lauren Sanderson Miller
Represented By: Douglas A Dellaccio, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?