Harris v. Standard Guaranty Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Martha C Harris
Defendant: Wells Fargo Companies, Standard Guaranty Insurance Company and Crawford & Company
Case Number: 2:2020cv00335
Filed: March 12, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Abdul K Kallon
Referring Judge: John E Ott
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 5, 2020 Filing 20 MOTION for Extension of Time to serve summons by Martha C Harris. (KAM)
May 5, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT - The parties having not unanimously consented to the dispositive jurisdiction by a Magistrate Judge, the above styled civil action has been randomly reassigned to the Honorable Abdul K. Kallon. Please use case number 2:20-cv-335-AKK on all subsequent pleadings. (KEK)
May 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER TO REASSIGN - Full consent is not possible within that period, and, accordingly, the Clerk of the Court is DIRECTED to reassign this action to a United States District Judge for all further proceedings. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Ott on 5/5/2020. (KEK)
May 5, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge John E Ott: Telephone Conference held on 5/5/2020. (BST, )
May 1, 2020 Filing 17 Summons Issued as to Crawford & Company, Wells Fargo Companies. mailed certified mail (KAM)
April 29, 2020 Filing 16 RESPONSE in Opposition re #2 MOTION to Dismiss and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by Martha C Harris. (KEK)
April 29, 2020 Filing 15 REPLY to Response to Motion re #7 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Martha C Harris. (KEK)
April 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER Telephone Conference set for 5/5/2020 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge John E Ott. The consent deadline is extended until 5/12/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Ott on 4/28/2020. (KAM)
April 24, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE by Standard Guaranty Insurance Company re #12 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Busby, Jennifer)
April 24, 2020 Filing 12 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Busby, Jennifer)
April 24, 2020 Filing 11 DISCOVERY Planning Report and REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting filed by Martha C Harris. (JLC)
April 22, 2020 Filing 10 RESPONSE in Opposition re #7 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Standard Guaranty Insurance Company. (Burke, Emily)
April 20, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge John E Ott: Telephone Conference held on 4/20/2020; pla did not participate; call will be reset. (BST, )
April 10, 2020 Filing 9 REPLY to Response to Motion re #2 MOTION to Dismiss and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by Standard Guaranty Insurance Company. (Burke, Emily)
April 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER defendant shall respond to the #7 Motion to Remand by April 22, 2020; Plaintiff may reply by April 29, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Ott on 4/9/2020. (KAM)
April 8, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Roderick R. Harris, Administrator of the Estate of Martha C Harris. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(JLC)
April 2, 2020 Filing 6 RESPONSE in Opposition re #2 MOTION to Dismiss and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by Martha C Harris. (Attachments: #1 A-K)(KEK)
March 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER that the parties are reminded that this case will be reassigned to a district judge on 5/4/20 unless they unanimously consent to jurisdiction by the undersigned magistrate; Telephone Conference set for 4/20/2020 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge John E. Ott; parties to call in as directed; if all parties submit an executed form 24 hours in advance, the telephone conference will be cancelled; Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Ott on 3/20/20. (BST, )
March 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER regarding compliance with Rule 26; Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 4/24/2020; Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Ott on 3/20/20. (BST, )
March 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 TEXT SUBMISSION ORDER re #2 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Standard Guaranty Insurance Company. Plaintiff shall file any opposition or other response to the motion by April 3, 2020; Movant may reply by April 10, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E. Ott on 3/20/2020. (SJB)
March 19, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION to Dismiss and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Standard Guaranty Insurance Company. (Busby, Jennifer)
March 12, 2020 Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number B4601104771 (KAM)
March 12, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Standard Guaranty Insurance Company from Jefferson County, case number 2020-cv-29., filed by Standard Guaranty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(KAM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harris v. Standard Guaranty Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Companies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Standard Guaranty Insurance Company
Represented By: Jennifer M Busby
Represented By: Emily Burke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crawford & Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martha C Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?