Pollard v. Publix Super Markets Inc
Plaintiff: Gerry Pollard
Defendant: Publix Super Markets Inc
Case Number: 2:2020cv00354
Filed: March 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: John E Ott
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SCHEDULING ORDER that certain time limits apply as set out; Discovery due by 4/15/2021; Dispositive Motions due by 5/3/2021; Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Ott on 4/20/2020. (BST, )
April 16, 2020 Filing 11 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Keith, Travis)
April 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 INITIAL ORDER; Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Ott on 4/16/2020. (BST, )
April 16, 2020 Filing 9 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Gerry Pollard, Publix Super Markets Inc..(BST, )
April 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER resetting telephone conference that was set today at 11:00 AM; Telephone Conference RESET for 4/22/2020 04:00 PM before Magistrate Judge John E Ott; parties to call 888-808-6929 and use access code 5917763 to participate; the parties are reminded that if all parties submit the consent forms by 4/22/20 at 9:00 a.m. the conference will be cancelled; Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Ott on 4/16/2020. (BST)
April 14, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE to remind parties of consent telephone conference scheduled for 11:00 AM on Thursday, 4/16/20; if all parties submit an executed consent form, either consenting or declining magistrate judge jurisdiction, by 4:00 PM on Wednesday, 4/15/20, the conference will be cancelled. (BST, )
April 9, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Julian M Hendrix on behalf of Gerry Pollard (Hendrix, Julian)
March 27, 2020 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-3564271. related document #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Publix Super Markets Inc from Jefferson County Circuit Court, case number 2020-900631., filed by Publix Super Markets Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(KAM). (Keith, Travis)
March 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER that the parties are reminded that this case will be reassigned to a district judge on 5/1/20 unless they unanimously consent to jurisdiction by the undersigned magistrate; Telephone Conference set for 4/16/2020 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge John E. Ott; parties to call in as directed; if all parties submit an executed form 24 hours in advance, the telephone conference will be cancelled; Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Ott on 3/20/20. (BST, )
March 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER regarding compliance with Rule 26; Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 4/21/2020; Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Ott on 3/20/20. (BST, )
March 17, 2020 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Publix Super Markets Inc. filed by Publix Super Markets Inc (Keith, Travis)
March 17, 2020 Filing 2 Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Publix Super Markets Inc.(Keith, Travis)
March 16, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Publix Super Markets Inc from Jefferson County Circuit Court, case number 2020-900631., filed by Publix Super Markets Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(KAM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pollard v. Publix Super Markets Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gerry Pollard
Represented By: Bobby Lendell Davis
Represented By: Julian M Hendrix
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Publix Super Markets Inc
Represented By: Travis Ian Keith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?