Thrasher v. Cadence Bank NA et al
Plaintiff: Angela Fox Thrasher
Defendant: HomeTown Lenders Inc, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Inc and Cadence Bank NA
Case Number: 2:2020cv00376
Filed: March 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Gray M Borden
Nature of Suit: Truth in Lending
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 25, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by C Steven Ball on behalf of HomeTown Lenders Inc (Ball, C)
March 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ORDER granting #5 Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants are ORDERED to file their responsive pleadings on or before 5/25/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gray M Borden on 3/23/2020. (KMAW)
March 23, 2020 Filing 5 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time by HomeTown Lenders Inc, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Inc. (Leavens, Ginny) Modified text and filers on 3/24/2020 (MRR, ).
March 23, 2020 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Inc. filed by Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Inc (Leavens, Ginny)
March 23, 2020 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Cadence Bank NA. filed by Cadence Bank NA (Leavens, Ginny)
March 19, 2020 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-3560218 (ALND reciept# B4601104935). related document #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Cadence Bank NA from Circuit Court of Shelby County, case number 58-cv-2020-900167., filed by Cadence Bank NA. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit A continued, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C)(MRR, ), COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Angela Fox Thrasher.- Deemed filed 2/17/20, Circuit Court of Shelby County (Doc 1-2 p26 of 69 complete pdf)(MRR, ). (Leavens, Ginny) Modified on 3/20/2020 (AKD).
March 19, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE REGARDING CONSENT to magistrate judge jurisdiction (MRR, )
March 19, 2020 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Angela Fox Thrasher.- Deemed filed 2/17/20, Circuit Court of Shelby County (Doc 1-2 p26 of 69 complete pdf)(MRR, )
March 19, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Cadence Bank NA from Circuit Court of Shelby County, case number 58-cv-2020-900167., filed by Cadence Bank NA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit A continued, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C)(MRR, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thrasher v. Cadence Bank NA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HomeTown Lenders Inc
Represented By: C Steven Ball
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Inc
Represented By: Ginny Willcox Leavens
Represented By: Gregory C Cook
Represented By: Michael Paul Taunton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cadence Bank NA
Represented By: Ginny Willcox Leavens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela Fox Thrasher
Represented By: Kenneth J Lay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?