Schultz et al v. Diamond Rubber Products Co
Plaintiff: Andrea D Conrad, Kasey L Holley, Mitchell S Schultz and Michael Phillips
Defendant: Diamond Rubber Products Co
Case Number: 2:2020cv00511
Filed: April 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Annemarie Carney Axon
Nature of Suit: Airplane Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 TEXT ORDER - The court GRANTS #16 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Bradley J. Stoll by Michael Phillips. Signed by Judge Annemarie Carney Axon on 6/4/20. (SAC)
June 4, 2020 PHV Fee paid: $ 75, receipt number 1126-3603000. (Awbrey, Nolan)
June 4, 2020 Filing 16 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Bradley J. Stoll by Michael Phillips. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Certificate of Good Standing)(Awbrey, Nolan)
May 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 TEXT ORDER - The court GRANTS #14 Motion for Leave to Appear pro hac vice for Richard Genter. Signed by Judge Annemarie Carney Axon on 5/22/20. (SAC)
May 21, 2020 PHV Fee paid: $ 75, receipt number 1126-3595320 (ALNd B4601106095). (Awbrey, Nolan) Modified on 5/22/2020 (KEK).
May 21, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Richard Genter by Andrea D Conrad, Kasey L Holley, Michael Phillips, Mitchell S Schultz. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Certificate of Good Standing)(Awbrey, Nolan)
May 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 TEXT ORDER granting the parties' #12 joint motion for an extension of the briefing schedule on Plaintiffs' #8 motion to remand. Defendant's response is now due on or before June 5, 2020. Plaintiffs' reply, if one is necessary, is due on or before June 12, 2020. Signed by Judge Annemarie Carney Axon on 5/18/2020. (RLW)
May 18, 2020 Filing 12 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time by Diamond Rubber Products Co. (Ronnlund, Robert)
May 14, 2020 Filing 11 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Diamond Rubber Products Co. filed by Diamond Rubber Products Co (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Ronnlund, Robert)
May 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 TEXT ORDER. This matter comes before the court on Plaintiffs' #8 motion to remand. Defendant's response is due on or before May 22, 2020. Plaintiffs' reply, if one is necessary, is due on or before May 29, 2020. The court DEFERS briefing on Plaintiffs' #9 motion for a stay until after this court has resolved its jurisdictional questions and the motion to remand. Signed by Judge Annemarie Carney Axon on 5/8/2020. (RLW)
May 8, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION to Stay by Kasey L Holley, Michael Phillips, Mitchell S Schultz. (Attachments: #1 Supplement, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit)(Awbrey, Nolan)
May 8, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to Remand by Kasey L Holley, Michael Phillips, Mitchell S Schultz. (Attachments: #1 Supplement, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit)(Awbrey, Nolan)
May 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TEXT ORDER. Pursuant to the discussion at the teleconference held on May 7, 2020, the court ORDERS Defendant Diamond Rubber Products Co. to file, on or before May 14, 2020, evidence establishing the citizenship of Plaintiff A.L. Conrad's mother. Signed by Judge Annemarie Carney Axon on 5/7/2020. (RLW)
May 7, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Annemarie Carney Axon: Telephone Conference re OTSC held on 5/7/2020. (SAC)
May 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ORDER - The court sets a Telephone Conference for May 7, 2020, 10:00 AM before Judge Annemarie Carney Axon. Counsel will receive the numbers required to join the call via e-mail. Signed by Judge Annemarie Carney Axon on 5/6/20. (SAC)
May 4, 2020 Filing 5 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Diamond Rubber Products Co. filed by Diamond Rubber Products Co (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8)(Ronnlund, Robert)
April 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - Diamond removed the case to federal court based on diversity jurisdiction. (Doc. #1 at 1). Because the court cannot tell from the notice of removal and the face of the complaint whether diversity jurisdiction exists, the court ORDERS Diamond to SHOW CAUSE, in writing, on or before May 4, 2020, why the court should not remand this case for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Signed by Judge Annemarie Carney Axon on 4/20/2020. (KEK)
April 17, 2020 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Diamond Rubber Products Co. filed by Diamond Rubber Products Co (Ronnlund, Robert)
April 16, 2020 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-3574047 (ALNd B4601105427) related document #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Diamond Rubber Products Co from Circuit Court of Jefferson County, Alabama, case number 01-cv-2020-901276, filed by Diamond Rubber Products Co. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - State complaint, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3)(KEK). (Ronnlund, Robert) Modified on 4/16/2020 (KEK).
April 16, 2020 Filing 2 Evidentiary Material re: #1 Notice of Removal, Corrected Exhibit 3. (Ronnlund, Robert)
April 15, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Diamond Rubber Products Co from Circuit Court of Jefferson County, Alabama, case number 01-cv-2020-901276, filed by Diamond Rubber Products Co. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - State complaint, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(KEK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Schultz et al v. Diamond Rubber Products Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diamond Rubber Products Co
Represented By: Robert M Ronnlund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrea D Conrad
Represented By: Nolan E Awbrey
Represented By: James J Thompson, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kasey L Holley
Represented By: Nolan E Awbrey
Represented By: James J Thompson, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mitchell S Schultz
Represented By: Nolan E Awbrey
Represented By: James J Thompson, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Phillips
Represented By: Nolan E Awbrey
Represented By: James J Thompson, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?