McClinton v. Cogency Global Inc
Plaintiff: Richard J McClinton
Defendant: Cogency Global Inc and Cogency Global Inc doing business as Capstone Logistics LLC
Case Number: 2:2020cv00543
Filed: April 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Anna M Manasco
Referring Judge: R David Proctor
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:12117ad
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 3, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT - this case has been reassigned to Judge Anna M Manasco. Judge R David Proctor no longer assigned to the case. (KAM)
May 13, 2020 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Richard J McClinton. Cogency Global Inc waiver sent on 5/7/2020, answer due 7/6/2020. (Edwards, Nicole)
May 11, 2020 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-3587645. related document #1 COMPLAINT against Cogency Global Inc, filed by Richard J McClinton. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(KAM). (Edwards, Nicole)
April 21, 2020 Filing 2 Request for service by certified mail filed by Richard J McClinton. (KAM)
April 21, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Cogency Global Inc, filed by Richard J McClinton. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(KAM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McClinton v. Cogency Global Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard J McClinton
Represented By: Blake Clifton Edwards
Represented By: Nicole Davis Edwards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cogency Global Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cogency Global Inc doing business as Capstone Logistics LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?