Cox v. Hatter et al
Plaintiff: Minnie Cox
Defendant: Jacqueline Presswood, Isodora Barham and Lawrence Hatter
Case Number: 2:2020cv00549
Filed: April 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Gray M Borden
Referring Judge: Abdul K Kallon
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 18, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Minnie Cox. (AKD)
June 11, 2020 Filing 10 Notice of Reassignment- The above-styled civil action has been reassigned to the Honorable Abdul K. Kallon. Judge Magistrate Judge Gray M Borden no longer assigned to the case. Please use case number 2:20-549-AKK on all subsequent pleadings. (MRR, )
June 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER- The court's January 2, 2015 General Order calls for reassignment to a district judge following the occurrence of the first of three "triggering events" absent unanimous consent; None of these events have occurred and it appears that no such events will occur in a a timely manner; The case is now due to be assigned to a district judge. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gray M Borden on 6/11/20. (MRR, )
June 3, 2020 Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Isodora Barham, Lawrence Hatter, Jacqueline Presswood, filed by Minnie Cox.(MRR, )
May 21, 2020 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Isodora Barham, Lawrence Hatter, Jacqueline Presswood, filed by Minnie Cox. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8)(MRR, )
May 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER- It is ORDERED that, on or before May 26, 2020, plaintiff shall file an amended complaint that cures the deficiencies and complied with the instructions outlined within; It is further ORDERED that Cox's motion to proceed in forma pauperis (Doc 2 ) is DENIED with leave to refile upon the submission of an amended complaint.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gray M Borden on 5/12/20. (MRR, )
May 1, 2020 Filing 5 Evidentiary Material. filed by Minnie Cox (MRR, )
April 23, 2020 Filing 4 Evidentiary Material. filed by Minnie Cox (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(MRR, )
April 23, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE REGARDING CONSENT to magistrate judge jurisdiction (MRR, )
April 22, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Minnie Cox. (MRR, )
April 22, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Minnie Cox. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(MRR, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cox v. Hatter et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jacqueline Presswood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Isodora Barham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lawrence Hatter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Minnie Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?