Scoggins v. Richardson et al
Plaintiff: Christopher Scoggins
Defendant: Birmingham, City of and Richardson
Case Number: 2:2020cv00553
Filed: April 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Gray M Borden
Referring Judge: John E Ott
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 TEXT ORDER: On or before June 25, 2020, Plaintiff shall show cause, if any exists, why all claims against Defendant Officer Richardson should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gray M Borden on 06/11/2020. (RCP)
June 10, 2020 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT: This case is reassigned to Magistrate Judge Gray M Borden. Magistrate Judge John E Ott no longer assigned to the case. (KAM)
June 8, 2020 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Birmingham, City of.(Love, James)
April 24, 2020 Filing Fee received in the amount of $400.00, receipt number B4601105542. (JLC)
April 22, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Birmingham, City of from Jefferson County Circuit Court, case number 01-cv-2020-901044. (), filed by Birmingham, City of.(KAM) Modified on 6/9/2020 (BST, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Scoggins v. Richardson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Birmingham, City of
Represented By: James D Love
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richardson
Represented By: James D Love
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Scoggins
Represented By: Terrell E McCants
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?